The Body Firm, LLC v. JAMRM, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01920 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
JAMRM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Body Firm, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Fri 07/14 8:43 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc) Modified on 7/14/2023 (lc) |
|
Att: 1 minutes | ||
28 | 28
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 07/14 8:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice27 , and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 07/12 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Bond, Katherine) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 07/06 10:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation25 , and for good cause shown, the Court hereby CONTINUES the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 24, 2023. This is the final stipulation for this type of continuance that theCourt will entertain. If the parties have not executed their settlement agreement by the provided deadline, Defendant should proceed to timely answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (lc) |
|
25 | 25
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 07/05 2:23 PM
Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 24, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant JAMRM, LLC.(Heffner, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Parties' Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 06/01 9:29 AM
ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEFENDANT'S TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT TO JULY 10, 202323 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 05/31 3:54 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 10, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant JAMRM, LLC.(Heffner, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Parties' Third Stipulation For Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/24 2:19 PM
RDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sherry Rollo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JAMRM, LLC designating Warren F. James as local counsel20 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) |
|
21 | 21
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/24 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James F. Warren IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JAMRM, LLC designating Warren F. James as local counsel19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 05/22 5:22 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James F. Warren IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JAMRM, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35359163) filed by DEFENDANT JAMRM, LLC. (Warren, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 05/22 5:18 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James F. Warren IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JAMRM, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35358629) filed by DEFENDANT JAMRM, LLC. (Attorney James Fredrick Warren, IV added to party JAMRM, LLC(pty:dft)) (Warren, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 05/18 11:48 AM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JAMRM, LLC answer now due 6/8/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant JAMRM, LLC.(Heffner, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 05/10 12:44 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Defendant JAMRM, LLC's Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or LESS). The filing was reviewed for extending time to answer less than 30 days. The incorrect docket event used did NOT extend time to answer and requires a proposed order. The cited correct event would have prompted filer to set new answer due date. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/09 11:55 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant JAMRM, LLC.(Heffner, James) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/08 5:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JAMRM, LLC, identifying Gryphon Revision Operations, LLC - Affiliate; RVGD Aggregator LP - Affiliate; RVGD Rollco LLC - Affiliate; RVGD Topco LP - Affiliate; RVGD GP LLC - Affiliate; RVGD Intermediate LP - Affiliate; RVGD Intermediate GP LLC - Affiliate; Revision Parent LLC - Affiliate; Revision Holdco LLC - Affiliate; Revision Buyer LLC - Affiliate; Revision Holdings LLC - Direct Parent; Revision, LLC - Affiliate; JAMRM, LLC - Named Defendant; Goodier Parent LLC - Affiliate; Goodier Holdco LLC - Affiliate; Goodier Buyer LLC - Affiliate; Goodier Holdings LLC - Affiliate; Goodier Cosmetics, LLC - Affiliate. (Heffner, James) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 05/08 4:47 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James E Heffner counsel for Defendant JAMRM, LLC. Adding James E. Heffner as counsel of record for Defendant JAMRM, LLC d/b/a REVISION SKINCARE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant JAMRM, LLC d/b/a REVISION SKINCARE. (Attorney James E Heffner added to party JAMRM, LLC(pty:dft))(Heffner, James) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Errata
Fri 03/24 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. correcting Waiver of Service Executed,12 (Correcting Plaintiff's Counsel name) (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/22 4:08 PM
Notice of Filing of WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. upon JAMRM, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Sherry L. Rollo, Esq. Attorney. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 03/17 3:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 9:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant JAMRM, LLC. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:28 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:28 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 10:27 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 03/15 10:25 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Body Firm, LLC. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 10:20 AM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC, identifying The Body Firm, LLC, Guthy-Renker, LLC, an affiliated company of Plaintiff, and JAMRM, LLC d/b/a Revision Skincare. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 10:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34958626 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff The Body Firm, LLC. (Attorney Daniel Miles Cislo added to party The Body Firm, LLC(pty:pla))(Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |