John Doe v. Cerebral, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01919 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cerebral, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 04/17 12:06 PM
ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/04 3:57 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details* (gga) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/29 1:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:21 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Terence Coates to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe, designating Berry Anderson as local counsel19 . (iv) |
|
20 | 20
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Dylan Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe, designating Berry Anderson as local counsel18 . (iv) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/21 5:32 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Terence R. Coates to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/21/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34997823) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/21 5:30 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dylan J. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/21/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34997614) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/21 5:14 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Terence R. Coates to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34997823) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/21 5:12 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dylan J. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34997614) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:33 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:23-CV-01803; 2:23-CV-01828; and 2:23-CV-0190111 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Document accepted as filed. The Motion to Consolidate set on the court's April 20, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Briefing shall comply with local rules. (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Mon 03/20 5:27 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-01803 FMO(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01919 FMO(MAAx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/20 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. Related Case(s): 2:23-CV-01803; 2:23-CV-01828; 2:23-CV-01901; 2:23-cv-02021; 2:23-cv-02043; and 8:23-cv-00493 (Berry, M) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:11 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Motion11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 03/17 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:23-CV-01803; 2:23-CV-01828; and 2:23-CV-01901, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/16 11:21 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dylan J. Gould. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 9:06 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cerebral, Inc. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:04 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Doe, identifying Plaintiff. (Berry, M.) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 9:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 9:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Berry, M.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34958454 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attorney M. Anderson Berry added to party John Doe(pty:pla))(Berry, M.) |