Chengcheng Xu v. Jaddou Ur Mendoza et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | A Joel Richlin |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01922 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Susan M. Curda
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corina A. Luna
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaddou Ur-Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chengcheng Xu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
Wed 03/13 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:23-cv-01922-CAS-AJRx. (cbr) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Stayed
Thu 06/01 3:55 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Having read and considered the Joint Stipulation to Stay the Case Pending Adjudication of Application9 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until 4/19/2024. (gk) |
|
9 | 9
stip
Stay Case
Wed 05/31 11:48 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication Of Application filed by Defendant Susan M. Curda, Corina A. Luna, Jaddou Ur-Mendoza.(Attorney Evan R. Franke added to party Susan M. Curda(pty:dft), Attorney Evan R. Franke added to party Corina A. Luna(pty:dft), Attorney Evan R. Franke added to party Jaddou Ur-Mendoza(pty:dft))(Franke, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 10:45 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Susan M. Curda, Corina A. Luna and Jaddou Ur Mendoza. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 10:36 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff CHENGCHENG XU, (Spence, Joel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 10:34 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CHENGCHENG XU. (Spence, Joel) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 10:33 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff CHENGCHENG XU. (Spence, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 10:32 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34958977 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff CHENGCHENG XU. (Attorney Joel E. Spence added to party CHENGCHENG XU(pty:pla))(Spence, Joel) |