Varun Khanna v. Sanjay Logani et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01924 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doctorsoft Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanjay Logani
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
David Walsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Varun Khanna
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
order
Dismiss
Tue 01/23 3:25 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Defendants' counsel expressed no objection to Plaintiff's dismissal of his federal claims and the Court's dismissal of the state law claims without prejudice so that those claims could be litigated in state court. (See document for further details).; granting33 First REQUEST to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (aco) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 01/23 9:16 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First REQUEST to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action in the First Amended Complaint 33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Motion Hearing Compel
Tue 01/23 1:29 PM
MINUTES OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL, TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF FROM FILING A JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2, AND FOR THE COURT TO SET HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna30 Hearing held before Judge Percy Anderson. For the reasons stated on the record, the application is denied. By 3:00 p.m. on January 24, 2024, counsel are to notify the Court if they wish to dismiss their federal ERISA claims with prejudice whereupon the Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims and dismiss them without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(d). (See document for further details).; denying30 Ex Parte Application to Compel. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (aco) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 01/22 8:49 PM
First REQUEST to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action in the First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna. Request set for hearing on 1/24/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Fleming, Michael) |
|
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 01/22 10:09 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson. EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL, TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF FROM FILING A JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2, AND FOR THE COURT TO SET HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS filed by Plaintiff30 Varun Khanna. set for hearing by ZOOM on 1/22/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 01/19 9:33 PM
OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL, TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF FROM FILING A JOINT STIPULATION PURSU30 filed by Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani. (Bechtel, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Compel
Thu 01/18 9:31 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL, TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF FROM FILING A JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2, AND FOR THE COURT TO SET HEARING ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna.(Fleming, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael R. Fleming, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Continue
Tue 01/16 3:00 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Application is granted in part and denied in part: It is ordered that Plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment is due on January 29, 2024 and Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on February 5, 2024. (iv) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/12 11:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from February 5, 2024 to February 26, 202427 filed by Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani.(Bechtel, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew T. Bechtel, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Continue
Thu 01/11 11:03 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from February 5, 2024 to February 26, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna. (Fleming, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Varun Khanna, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Fleming, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment (Partial)
Mon 01/08 11:48 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First, Second, Third, Fourth, Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action filed by Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani. Motion set for hearing on 2/5/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Bechtel, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Dr. Sanjay Logani, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Sanjay Logani), | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Matthew T. Bechtel, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A (Matthew Bechtel), | ||
Att: 6 Separate Statement, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Tue 08/29 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) David Walsh has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 07/27 2:44 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court will make a final determination concerning its exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims at a later stage of the proceedings. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response
Mon 07/17 4:35 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna to Order to Show Cause,20 Regarding Court's Exercise of Supplemental Jurisdiction (Deol, John-Paul) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/10 8:17 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of January 29, 2024; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of February 5, 2024; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for March 15, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of April 9, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Fri 07/07 10:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates attached to this order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 1:30 PM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for hearing on 4/1/2024 at 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2024 at 9:00 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/07 9:44 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court orders the parties to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims asserted in the 1st AC. The parties shall file their responses to this Order to Show Cause by no later than July 17, 2023. (iv) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Fri 07/07 9:41 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/12/2024. (iv) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/03 5:13 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna.. (Fleming, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 06/01 3:07 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for July 17, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 06/01 12:06 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani, identifying None other than named Defendants. (Bechtel, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 05/31 11:40 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition14 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani.(Attorney Matthew T Bechtel added to party Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T Bechtel added to party Doctorsoft Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T Bechtel added to party Sanjay Logani(pty:dft))(Bechtel, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 05/01 5:21 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna (Deol, John-Paul) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/14 1:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation12 : IT IS SO ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint by May 1, 2023; 2. Defendants shall file any responsive pleading or motion to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by May 31, 2023. (bm) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Amend/Correct Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/12 12:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna.(Fleming, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/16 2:04 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 12:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna, (Fleming, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/16 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 12:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Advanced Retina Associates, Medical Group, Inc., Doctorsoft Corporation, Sanjay Logani. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:41 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:40 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/15 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Ryan Fleming on behalf of Plaintiff Varun Khanna (Attorney Michael Ryan Fleming added to party Varun Khanna (pty:pla))(Fleming, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 11:12 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff's attorney Varun Khanna. (Deol, John-Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 11:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Varun Khanna. (Deol, John-Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34959500 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff's attorney Varun Khanna. (Attorney John-Paul Singh Deol added to party Varun Khanna (pty:pla))(Deol, John-Paul) |