Catherine Moody v. Hot Topic, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Monica Ramirez Almadani |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00447 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hot Topic, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Moody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Cohn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/16 11:01 AM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The Court has reviewed the parties' Status Report updating the Court on mediation and settlement efforts [ECF54 ]. The Court orders the parties to file a new status report by May 14, 2024, updating the Court on their progress. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/12 3:55 PM
STATUS REPORT [JOINT] filed by Plaintiffs Andrew Cohn, Catherine Moody. (Franzini, Simon) |