Blanca Vences v. Hertz Transporting, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00472 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court, County of Orange, 30-02023-01306687 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hertz Transporting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Hertz Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Vences
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 01/02 12:49 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)-(ii) filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation.(Gentin, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice | ||
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 05/15 2:32 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing is not necessary. In view of the Scheduling Order issued May 15, 2023 [ECF No. 15], the Scheduling Conference set for May 19, 2023, is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Mon 05/15 2:10 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/9/2024. (cla) |
|
15 | 15
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 05/15 2:09 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: Discovery cut-off 1/12/2024, Last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/9/2024, Dispositive Motions cut-off 3/22/2024, Motions in Limine cut-off 4/26/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2024 at 1:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 5/20/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/04 5:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation.. (Gentin, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/20 10:54 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 10:51 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
11 | 11
trial
Jury Demand
Mon 03/20 10:41 AM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Blanca Vences.. (Yeremenko, Vadim) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/15 4:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation, re Declaration4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Declaration3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on March 15, 2023. (Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 12:03 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation (Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 12:02 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation, identifying 1. Plaintiff Blanca Vences; 2. Defendant Hertz Transporting, Inc.; and 3. Defendant The Hertz Corporation.. (Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/15 12:00 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Gentin re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation. (Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/15 11:59 AM
DECLARATION of Ivonne Cabada re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation. (Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 11:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hertz Transporting, Inc., The Hertz Corporation. (Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
1 | 1
74
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Orange, case number 30-2023 01306687 Receipt No: ACACDC-34959900 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants The Hertz Corporation, Hertz Transporting, Inc.. (Attorney Jamie C. Pollaci added to party Hertz Transporting, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jamie C. Pollaci added to party The Hertz Corporation(pty:dft))(Pollaci, Jamie) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 11:48 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Blanca Vences in Orange County Superior Court on 2/8/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 11:53 AM
NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Hertz Transporting, Inc. and The Hertz Corporation, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) |