CDM Holding Group, LLC et al v. Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01923 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Central, 3:22-cv-03163 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:45 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Tidal Commerce Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
CDM Holding Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Super G Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Tidal Commerce Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tidal Commerce Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CDM Holding Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Super G Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
155 | 155
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/01 11:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DESIGNATING RELATED LAWSUIT AS LEAD CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Yesterday, the Court granted Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate this case and related lawsuit Case No. 8:21-cv-01204-CJC-DFMx. (Dkt. 159.) The Court now designates Case No. 8:21-cv-01204-CJC-DFMx as the lead case. All future filings shall be made only in the lead case. This case is administratively CLOSED. No further filings shall be made in this case. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint in the lead case no later than 14 days following entry of this Order. The parties need not file any responses to the current pleadings in this case. The pending discovery motions (Dkts. 132, 146) shall be immediately refiled in the lead case and heard on the same hearing schedule, unless the relevant parties stipulate otherwise. All parties in the consolidated action should confer and propose a revised Scheduling Order by December 22, 2023. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
154 | 154
order
Stay Case Consolidate Cases
Fri 12/01 8:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE [Dkt. 129] AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT TIDAL COMMERCE, INC.S MOTION TO STAY [Dkt. 127] by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Finding as moot127 MOTION to Stay Case; Granting129 Motion to Consolidate Cases: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate is GRANTED. Tidal's motion to stay is therefore DENIED AS MOOT. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
153 | 153
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 11/28 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third-Party Defendants Michael J Cavallaro, MJC Partners, LLC, Alexander Renzi, identifying MJC Partners, LLC. (Edwards, Derek) |