Lyonell Curry v. Univar Solutions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01930 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV02942 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 5:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Univar Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Lyonell Curry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 10/27 9:20 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by Lyonell Curry Lyonell Curry.(Mohsin, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Thu 04/27 11:11 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than February 26, 2024. (smo) |
|
14 | 14
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 04/27 11:08 AM
ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2024 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/7/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/27 11:02 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on May 8, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 04/20 2:57 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Plaintiff's Report11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Report
Thu 04/20 1:40 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Lyonell Curry. (Zambrano, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/16 4:13 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/16 11:24 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:17 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Wed 03/15 10:09 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc.. Ex. B-Superior Court documents as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . (Lerner, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc., identifying Lyonell Curry, West Coast Employment Lawyers, APLC, Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Lerner, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 2:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Lerner, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Lerner, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV02942 Receipt No: ACACDC-34961588 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew David Lerner added to party Univar Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lerner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 29 pgs Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Other court docs, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 11:25 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Univar Solutions, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Lyonell Curry. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/9/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 11:30 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/13/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/16 11:28 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Lyonell Curry, upon Defendant Univar Solutions, Inc. served on 2/13/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jenn Bautista in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/14/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |