Clifton Walker v. Kathleen M. Mayberry
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01932 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 1:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kathleen M. Mayberry
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Clifton Walker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 10/13 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 09/29 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 08/09 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (DKT.16 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 8/8/2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt.17 ). The Court accepts the Notice of Settlement as a Response to the Order to Show Cause and sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for October 6, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by September 29, 2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Settlement
Tue 08/08 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/01 11:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than August 8, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint (however, if the deadline to Answer has already passed, plaintiff(s) must also submit a Request for Default or Stipulation Extending Time to Answer); Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (FRCivP 41). (lom) |
|
15 | 15
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 08/01 11:08 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 11:34 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-047) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01932-WLH (AFMx). (et) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 04/04 3:58 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other state claim set forth in the complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 USC 1367(c)(4). (jp) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Mon 04/03 11:14 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walkerto Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/20 11:43 AM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than April 3, 2023. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION] (es) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:01 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kathleen M. Mayberry. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Thu 03/16 1:59 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jre) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/16 1:58 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 2:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 2:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34961726 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Clifton Walker(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |