Diamond Strike LLC et al v. Wealth Accelerators Global, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | District Court, A-23-865712-C |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Wealth Accelerators Global LLC
Alverson Taylor & sanders 6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89149 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sarah Waldrop
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Sancho
Alverson Taylor & Sanders 6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89149 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priyanka Ramlakhan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erica Newberry
|
|
Defendant
Dylan Newberry
|
|
Defendant
Eric Fiore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juts Trucking LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindon Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicolas Mahone
Raich Law 6785 S Eastern Ave Suite 5
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elegions LLC
Raich Law 6785 S Eastern Ave Suite 5
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diamond Strike LLC
Raich Law 6785 S. Eastern Ave Suite 5
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rashaad Bolton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BJ Delivery Express Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Aristy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ameriecom LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response
Mon 11/20 9:42 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Removal by Defendant Dylan Newberry. (ALZ) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Stipulation
Thu 05/04 1:06 PM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.14 Stipulation for Arbitration : IT IS ORDERED that the Parties are to attend the Arbitration pursuant to the dispute resolution clause contained in the Trucking Agreements and the claims arising from that agreement are hereby stayed pending the outcome of the arbitration; IT IS ORDERED that the claims arising from the Alliance Agreements are hereby stayed pending the outcome of the Arbitration, but are not to be included in the Arbitration; IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 6 ) is hereby taken off calendar and denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation
Wed 05/03 3:46 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Arbitration by Plaintiffs Ameriecom LLC, Jose Aristy, BJ Delivery Express Inc, Rashaad Bolton, Diamond Strike LLC, Elegions LLC, Juts Trucking LLC, Nicolas Mahone, Lindon Smith.(Raich, Sagar) (other) (settlement) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order for Arbitration | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 04/27 1:23 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.12 Stipulation : Response to ECF No.6 Motion to Dismiss is due by 5/8/2023 . Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 9:15 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) for Plaintiff to file an Opposition re6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Wealth Accelerators Global LLC. (Knecht, Adam) (extend) (sumjgm) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/31 5:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wealth Accelerators Global LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Jaxter, LLC, Corporate Parent MS Enterprise Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Gabee, LLC, Corporate Parent CF Investment Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent EJF Strat Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Fleetwood Concepts, LLC, Corporate Parent A1 Logistics, LLC, Corporate Parent Chudney Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Infinity Capital Holdings, LLC for Wealth Accelerators Global LLC added.. (Knecht, Adam) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/30 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ameriecom LLC, Jose Aristy, BJ Delivery Express Inc, Rashaad Bolton, Diamond Strike LLC, Elegions LLC, Juts Trucking LLC, Nicolas Mahone, Lindon Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Raich, Sagar) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/28 7:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Fiore, Priyanka Ramlakhan, Michael Sancho, Sarah Waldrop, Wealth Accelerators Global LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
minord
Minute Order
Tue 03/28 12:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/28/2023. The amended certificate of interested parties filed by Defendants again fails to comply with this Court's orders or the governing rules. Such a filing must, inter alia, "name" those individuals or entities whose citizenship is attributable to that party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). The amended certificate of interested parties does not identify the members of Wealth Accelerators Global LLC. Defendants must file a proper certificate of interested parties or respond to the pending order to show cause by April 3, 2023. See Docket No. 7. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Show Cause
Mon 03/27 1:10 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On March 16, 2023, the Court ordered Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file certificates of interested parties that comply with Rule 7.1(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by March 24, 2023. ECF Nos.4 ,5 . All of the parties violated that order. Accordingly, Plaintiffs, Defendants, and their counsel of record (Sagar Raich, Brian Westphal Schneider, Kurt Bonds, Adam Knecht) are ORDERED to show cause in writing, by April 3, 2023 , why they should not be sanctioned in a fine of up to $1,000 each. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Filing proper certificates of interested parties by that date will suffice to discharge this order to show cause as to the filing party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion Dismiss
Tue 03/21 5:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Eric Fiore, Priyanka Ramlakhan, Michael Sancho, Sarah Waldrop, Wealth Accelerators Global LLC. Responses due by 4/4/2023.(Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/16 1:07 PM
ORDER - Plaintiffs must file a certificate of interested parties by March 24, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/16 1:00 PM
ORDER - Defendants must file an amended certificate of interested parties complying with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) by March 24, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Fiore, Priyanka Ramlakhan, Michael Sancho, Sarah Waldrop, Wealth Accelerators Global LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
2 | 2
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Wed 03/15 3:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/15/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/30/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Wed 03/15 2:31 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-23-865712-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7236880) by Wealth Accelerators Global LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/25/2023. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Covesheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 03/15 3:14 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TRW) |