Fashionphile Group, LLC v. Madison Avenue Couture, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01937 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:41 AM PDT |
Cross Claimant
Madison Avenue Couture, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Jason Seabra
|
|
Defendant
Madison Avenue Couture, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Seabra
an individual 123 Main Street
Newark, NJ 07105 |
|
Plaintiff
Fashionphile Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
50 | 50
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 02/01 3:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court continues the scheduling conference to May 6, 2024. The clerk has entered the default of cross defendant Jason Seabra. Cross-claimant Madison Avenue Couture is ordered to file a motion for default judgment, if it intends to do so, no later than April 1, 2024. Failure to do so may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/31 2:34 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Order to Show Cause entered on January 24, 2024 (dkt.48 ) was issued in error and may be disregarded. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk) |