Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01935 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 05/23 10:53 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL The Court, having considered the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal of Action pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure16 , hereby dismisses with prejudice the above-entitled action. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Court VACATES all dates and deadlines. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 05/22 4:42 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement of the parties filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP.(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/05 10:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties Notice of Settlement14 , indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. By May 24, 2023, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. All other dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Settlement
Thu 05/04 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Settlement AND REQUEST FOR 14 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO CLOSE SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP.(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/24 1:22 PM
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On April 22, 2023, Plaintiff filed a proper First Amended Complaint. As the pending motion to dismiss was based on a complaint that is no longer operative, the motion is DENIED as MOOT. (lc) |
|
Saturday, April 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Sat 04/22 10:37 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC(Stieglitz, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 04/12 6:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP, Does. (Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
misc
For Judicial Notice
Wed 04/12 6:10 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF DEFENDANT ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF BRIAN K. CONDON filed by Defendants Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP, Does.(Attorney Brian Keith Condon added to party Does(pty:dft))(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 03/17 3:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 5:18 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 5:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) |
|
5 | 5
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/16 2:21 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP.(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/15 4:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP, Notice to Clerk and Plaintiff of Removal to the United States District Court served on March 15, 2023. (Condon, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 3:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP.(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 3:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP, identifying United HealthCare Services, Inc..(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV36696 Receipt No: ACACDC-34962534 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP. (Attorney Brian Keith Condon added to party Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP(pty:dft))(Condon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 59 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 5:23 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP, Doe 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. Filed in State Court on 11/21/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/16 5:30 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, upon Defendant Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP served on 2/13/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/21/2023 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 (car) |