Arsen Avagyan v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01944 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Arsen Avagyan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 06/07 8:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation18 , the Court hereby orders that the matter is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, each side to bear his and its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) |
|
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 06/06 10:36 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Boos, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/14 10:11 PM
DECLARATION of Haik Beloryan re Scheduling Conference - optional html form,,13 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel for Plaintiff Arsen Avagyan filed by Plaintiff Arsen Avagyan. (Shakhgeldyan, Vahe) |
|
16 | 16
9
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/14 2:52 PM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
15 | 15
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Fri 04/14 2:51 PM
PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/14 2:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER (AND ATTACHMENT) CAREFULLY: The post-settlement status conference is set for September 8, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The pretrial conference is set for October 6, 2023 at 10:00 AM. The jury trial is set for October 16, 2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DATES AND DEADLINES. (jgr) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Fri 04/14 12:01 PM
MINUTES OF Mandatory Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court hears from the parties on the contents of their Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The Court will issue a separate Case Management Order. Defendant is directed to provide Plaintiff with the information and supporting documents on which it relied when it denied Plaintiff's insurance claim by no later than April 14, 2023. Plaintiff is ordered to correct the docket to reflect Mr. Beloryan's status as lead counsel by no later than April 14, 2023. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jgr) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Thu 04/13 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Nicholas J. Boos counsel for Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. Changing Firm Name to Maynard Nexsen. Changing Email to nboos@maynardnexsen.com. Filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 04/04 5:19 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Boos, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/16 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Jury Demand. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/16 1:19 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on April 14, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by April 4, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/16 1:17 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 7:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Liberty Mutual Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Boos, Nicholas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 03/15 7:07 PM
Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Boos, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 7:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 7:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22BBCV00648 Receipt No: ACACDC-34964478 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attorney Nicholas J. Boos added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Boos, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Nicholas Boos in Support of Notice of Removal of Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit S | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 1:19 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, Inclusive, Safeco Insurance Company of America., filed by plaintiff Arsen Avagyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/12/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/16 1:22 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arsen Avagyan, upon Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 9/16/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyer Incorporating Service, Registerd Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/28/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT O) (ghap) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 1:24 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/17/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT P)(ghap) |