Karina Espitia v. Laboratory Corporation of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01942 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV37550 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Laboratory Corporation of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Karina Espitia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Staying Case
Thu 10/05 8:24 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF RELATED CASE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 7/18/2023, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause ("OSC") why this action should not be stayed pending the outcome of three related cases: Bermejo v. Laboratory Corporation of America, Case No. CV 20-5337 DMG (SKx) (C.D. Cal.) ("Bermejo"), Poole v. Laboratory Corporation of America, Case No. CV 21-1805 AWI (CDB) (E.D. Cal.), and Aguilar v. Laboratory Corporation of America, Case No. CV 22-9061 DMG (SKx) (C.D. Cal.)20 . The Court finds that good cause exists to stay this case. The action is therefore STAYED and administratively closed pending the conclusion of the Bermejo proceedings. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within ten days after the conclusion of the Bermejo case, indicating whether this action should be consolidated with Aguilar, whether the stay should be lifted, and, if so, proposing new dates and deadlines. The 7/18/2023 OSC is DISCHARGED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response
Tue 08/08 10:44 AM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of Americato Order to Show Cause,,20 (Eddington, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response
Tue 08/01 5:35 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Karina Espitiato Order to Show Cause,,20 (Hacopian, Haik) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/19 12:25 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE STAYED by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Accordingly, the Court defers entering a scheduling and case management order at this time. Instead, the Court ORDERS the parties to show cause why this action should not be stayed pending the outcome of one or more of the three cases identified above, including information regarding what proportion of the putative class members in this case would overlap with those of the related cases. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs response to this Order shall be filed by August 1, 2023; Defendants response to Plaintiff's filing shall be filed by August 8, 2023. (rolm) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/01 10:53 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on June 9, 2023. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report
Fri 05/26 1:47 PM
Joint REPORT of Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Karina Espitia. (Hacopian, Haik) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 04/25 3:00 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2023 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) |
|
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/25 2:58 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having reviewed Plaintiff's response15 , the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause, dated April 18, 202314 . IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Response
Fri 04/21 5:50 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Karina Espitiato Order to Show Cause14 (Hacopian, Haik) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/18 4:45 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/25/2023. (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/22 10:47 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only11 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,10 served on 3/22/2023. (Eddington, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/21 4:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (CV-34),9 , Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8 served on 3/20/2023. (Eddington, Neil) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 2:40 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/20 1:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 21-01 filed on 3/17/2023. (vdr) |
|
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Fri 03/17 4:06 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05337 DMG(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01942 DMG(SKx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:48 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:47 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-09061 DMG(SKx); 2:20-cv-05337 DMG(SKx) (Eddington, Neil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 5:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, identifying K&L Gates LLP; Laboratory Corporation of America; Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings; Karina Espitia. (Eddington, Neil) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 5:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America identifying Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings as Corporate Parent. (Eddington, Neil) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 5:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Eddington, Neil) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV37550 Receipt No: ACACDC-34964196 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Attorney Neil Arthur Eddington added to party Laboratory Corporation of America(pty:dft))(Eddington, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Neil A. Eddington in Support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Bing Chun Lin in Support of Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 2:38 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Karina Espitia in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/30/2022, attached to Eddington Decl. as Exhibit A. (jtil) |