Firpo Wycoff Carr v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01813 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Aug 30, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Firpo Wycoff Carr
4067 Hardwick Street No. 330
Lakewood, CA 90712 |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
69 | 69
order
Dismiss
Tue 03/26 6:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS64 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Because the Court has previously granted Carr leave to amend his Complaint, and such amendment was unsuccessful, the Court DISMISSES Carr's Second Amended Complaint WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lc) |