Curtis Smith et al v. LA County Sheriff Dept. Men Central Jail
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01870 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Fri 03/17 3:16 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES (PRISONER NON-HABEAS CASE) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Denying2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. As explained in the attached statement, because it is absolutely clear that the deficiencies in the complaint cannot be cured by amendment, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See document for further details. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (es) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Wed 03/15 2:43 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Smith, Jack Thibodeaux. (lh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights)
Wed 03/15 2:39 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant LA County Sheriff Dept. Men Central Jail pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Smith. (lh) |