Inner Community Apt LLC v. Maria E. Grimaldo et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01893 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
David Cisneros
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Maria E. Grimaldo
11914 Wilmington Avenue, Unit F
Los Angeles, CA 90059 |
|
Plaintiff
Inner Community Apt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Fri 06/09 2:33 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, South Central District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, South Central District. (gk) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Fri 03/31 2:15 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, South Central District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, South Central District. (gk) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/31 2:12 PM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis because the District Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, removal jurisdiction. The action is frivolous or malicious. This case is REMANDED to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 22CMUD01827, as explained in the attached statement. ( MD JS-6, Case Terminated. ) (gk) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 03/30 10:40 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Compton Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Inner Community Apt LLC. (Attorney Helen G Long added to party Inner Community Apt LLC(pty:pla)) (Long, Helen) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:02 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maria E. Grimaldo. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/15 10:56 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by defendant Maria E. Grimaldo. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles, case number 22MUD01827 with CONFORMED FILED COPY OF copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen L Stevenson., filed by defendant Maria E. Grimaldo. (ghap) (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 (3/15/2023) CV-71 |