Hoang Minh Le v. Gibraltar Capital Fund, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00452 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gibraltar Capital Fund, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Hoang Minh Le
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 05/15 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Hoang Minh Le. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Tsao, Pamela) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/27 3:43 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed April 27, 2023 [Dkt.12 ], indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By June 26, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of June 27, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Settlement
Thu 04/27 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Settlement of Entire Action filed by plaintiff Hoang Minh Le. (Tsao, Pamela) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/27 10:50 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/23 1:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hoang Minh Le, upon Defendant Gibraltar Capital Fund, LLC served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Claudette Leslie - Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tsao, Pamela) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:22 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Gibraltar Capital Fund, LLC. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:17 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:10 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:23-cv-452 SSS (SPx). (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hoang Minh Le, identifying Certificate. (Tsao, Pamela) | |
3 | 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Hoang Minh Le. (Tsao, Pamela) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hoang Minh Le. (Tsao, Pamela) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34953814 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Hoang Minh Le. (Attorney Pamela Tsao added to party Hoang Minh Le(pty:pla))(Tsao, Pamela) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Photos |