Eugene Hoffman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00475 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Transunion, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Terminated: 08/10/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 08/11 1:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party33 : Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, Nationstar Mortgage LLC is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (bm) |
|
33 | 33
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 08/10 9:59 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman.(Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Fri 07/28 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 07/13 12:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the Courts OSC. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/06 12:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/10/2023. (twdb) Modified on 7/6/2023 (twdb) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 06/09 2:49 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 06/08 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly Christine Albright counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Kelly Albright is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Albright, Kelly) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Appearance
Thu 06/08 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hannah Kimberly Bensen on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attorney Hannah Kimberly Bensen added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bensen, Hannah) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/06 3:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 and Defenses filed by Defendant Transunion, LLC.(Singh, Ritka) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/12 11:44 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Transunion, LLC, identifying Corporate Parents: TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion; Affiliate: T. Rowe Price Group, Inc.. (Singh, Ritka) |
|
24 | 24
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 05/12 11:42 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Transunion, LLC answer now due 6/6/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Transunion, LLC.(Attorney Ritka Singh added to party Transunion, LLC(pty:dft))(Singh, Ritka) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Settlement
Fri 05/12 8:38 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only) filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/05 8:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
21 | 21
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 05/05 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on July 6, 2023. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 05/04 5:55 PM
Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, (Baumann, Katalina) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 05/04 5:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Baumann, Katalina) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/27 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Albright, Kelly) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 04/27 4:19 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 5/13/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Kelly Christine Albright added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Albright, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/25 12:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/27/2023. (twdb) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/24 7:20 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer now due 5/5/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Attorney Katalina Baumann added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft))(Baumann, Katalina) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/05 1:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 04/05 1:55 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 5/5/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 3:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz - C.T. Corp Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/20 7:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/17/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Justin Walton. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 3:23 PM
CORRECTED 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Transunion, LLC. (car) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Thu 03/16 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Incorrect event selected in the docketing of the Summons8 . Summons will be issued in the correct event. Docket item 8 should be disregarded. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 2:55 PM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 3/16/2023, SEE ITEM9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Transunion, LLC. (car) Modified on 3/16/2023 (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 2:50 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 2:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 10:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 10:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman, (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 10:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 10:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34964913 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eugene Hoffman. (Attorney Joseph Brian Angelo added to party Eugene Hoffman(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph) |