Villadelgado v. Burks
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00408 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gregory Burks
|
|
Plaintiff
Goderick Villadelgado
1237799 High Desert State Prison PO Box 650
Indian Springs, NV 89070 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/05 9:05 AM
ORDER adopting4 Report and Recommendations. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 7/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 06/15 9:06 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)
Fri 03/17 4:36 PM
ORDER. IFP/Payment of filing fees due 4/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Inmate Form/Instructions - Copy attached for distribution to P via HDSP law library | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Thu 03/16 10:03 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Thu 03/16 10:00 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (HAM) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 03/16 7:39 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF) |