David Faris v. Petit Pot, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01955 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Petit Pot, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Faris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
53 | 53
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 09/26 2:37 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT PETIT POT, INC. TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) [filed 9/1/23; Docket No.44 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's FAC is DISMISSED without leave to amend, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (iv) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
52 | 52
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 09/20 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) 44(Omoto, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Statement of Decision | ||
51 | 51
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 09/20 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) 44(Boyd, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION GRANTING DEFENDANT PETIT POT, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) |