Doe et al v. Washoe County School District et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Larry R Hicks |
Referred: | Craig S Denney |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Washoe County School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Washoe County School District Board of Trustees
Terminated: 06/05/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld
Terminated: 06/05/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Reply
Fri 04/19 2:22 PM
REPLY to Response to32 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Response
Fri 04/12 3:14 PM
RESPONSE to32 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Replies due by 4/19/2024. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/05 10:48 AM
ORDER granting 33 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/5/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation
Fri 04/05 9:53 AM
Second STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (Schulewitch, Andrea) (stay) (nondispositive) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Motion Dismiss
Fri 03/29 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. Responses due by 4/12/2024.(Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex1, TPo_Redacted | ||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
cmp
Complaint Amended
Fri 03/15 3:09 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jane Doe by Jane Doe. No changes to parties. (Chattah, Sigal) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 02/14 3:31 PM
ORDERED that Defendant Washoe County School District's motion to dismiss (ECF No.23 ) the Complaint (ECF No.1 ) is GRANTED . In her individual capacity, Plaintiff Jane Doe, i.e., Guardian Plaintiff, is DISMISSED , with prejudice, as a party in this action for lack of standing. Plaintiffs' first cause of action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs' second through seventh causes of action are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a first amended complaint within 30 days from the date of entry of this Order (3/15/2024) if they believe they may cure the deficiencies the Court identified in this Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/14/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply
Tue 07/11 3:26 PM
REPLY to Response to23 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Washoe County School District. (Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response
Tue 06/13 2:15 PM
RESPONSE to23 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Replies due by 6/20/2023. (Chattah, Sigal) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 06/06 9:54 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.25 Stipulation to Dismiss and Extension of Time. Defendants SUSAN ENFIELD AND BOARD OF TRUSTEES are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.23 is due by June 20, 2023 . Defendant's deadline to file reply to Plaintiff's response to Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.23 ) is due by July 11, 2023 . Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
26 | 26
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 06/05 10:48 AM
ORDER granting 24 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed until a ruling by the District Judge on the Motion to Dismiss. If the motion is denied, the parties have twenty (20) days to submit a Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order to the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation
Fri 06/02 3:08 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL and Extension of Time to Respond by Plaintiffs J. Doe, Jane Doe. (Chattah, Sigal) (dismissal) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Fri 06/02 1:49 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (Schulewitch, Andrea) (stay) (nondispositive) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Motion Dismiss
Tue 05/23 2:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. Responses due by 6/6/2023. (Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
22 | 22
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 05/23 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Washoe County School District Board of Trustees. Washoe County School District Board of Trustees waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/4/2023. (Pick, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 05/16 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
20 | 20
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 05/16 1:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Washoe County School District Board of Trustees. Washoe County School District Board of Trustees waiver sent on 5/5/2023, answer due 7/4/2023. (Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Standing Order
Mon 05/15 1:54 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Mon 05/15 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin A. Pick on behalf of Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (Pick, Kevin) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Mon 05/15 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Judy A. Prutzman on behalf of Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (Prutzman, Judy) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Mon 05/15 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrea L Schulewitch on behalf of Defendants Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (Schulewitch, Andrea) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe, J. Doe. Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld served on 5/5/2023. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 10:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe, J. Doe. Washoe County School District served on 5/5/2023. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Tue 04/25 10:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/25/2023. Local Rule 7.1-1 directs the parties to file a Certificate of Interested Parties identifying "all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) that have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case." Plaintiffs have filed two Certificate of Interested Parties ECF Nos. 3 , 9 identifying JANE DOE guardian of J. DOE as having an interest in the outcome of this case. However, the Court finds that this is neither helpful nor informative in evaluating the case for possible disqualifications or recusal. Thus, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs are to file a corrected and SEALED Certificate of Interested Parties so that the Court may evaluate the parties for potential conflicts of interest. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KJM) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 9:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld. (DLS) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Fri 04/21 5:15 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued SUSAN ENFIELD by Plaintiffs J. Doe, Jane Doe. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 04/21 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by J. Doe, Jane Doe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice Other
Fri 04/14 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA OF CORRECTION by J. Doe, Jane Doe.. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/04 7:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washoe County School District, and Susan Endfeld. (DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Susan Enfeld | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/04 7:22 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washoe County School District, and Susan Endfeld. (DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Susan Enfeld | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Mon 04/03 5:14 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued SUSAN ENFELD by Plaintiffs J. Doe, Jane Doe. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Mon 04/03 5:14 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued WASHOE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT by Plaintiffs J. Doe, Jane Doe. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/28 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by J. Doe, Jane Doe that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Chattah, Sigal) |
|
misc
QC Notice
Tue 03/28 1:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Jane Doe, J. Doe. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/4/2023. (no image attached) (EDS) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 03/17 8:58 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (CJS) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Washoe County School District, Washoe County School District Board of Trustees, Washoe County School District Superintendent, Dr. Susan Endfeld (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7238087) by Jane Doe, J. Doe. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. Proof of service due by 6/14/2023. (Gilbert, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |