Kevin Cox v. David Mouallem et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01970 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
David Mouallem
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Cox
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 07/07 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/07 2:55 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing by 7/11/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to David Mouallem. (jp) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/15 12:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox, upon Defendant David Mouallem served on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Mouallem, As Trustee of the David Mouallem Family Trust in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 04/04 3:56 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other state claim set forth in the complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 USC 1367(c)(4). (jp) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Mon 04/03 4:44 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kevin Coxto Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/20 11:45 AM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than April 3, 2023. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/17 8:57 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jre) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 8:56 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:53 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant David Mouallem. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:49 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 2:13 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 2:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 2:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34969615 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kevin Cox(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |