Mary S. Gimino v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01972 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 09/27 1:48 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, Related to: Memorandum & Opinion17 . In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed herewith, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is affirmed and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) |
|
17 | 17
10
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 09/27 1:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, The ALJ's denial of benefits is affirmed and this case is dismissed withprejudice. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Wed 08/16 9:41 PM
BRIEF filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal)11 . (Chan, Caspar) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/18 4:28 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply14 Based on the Parties' Stipulation for Extension and for cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner's Brief shall be due on or before August 16, 2023, with all other dates extended accordingly. (es) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/14 2:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)11 filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Chan, Caspar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 07/14 10:12 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Jennifer Lee Tarn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 07/14 9:54 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caspar I Chan counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Caspar Chan as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Caspar I Chan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Chan, Caspar) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Thu 06/15 8:56 PM
BRIEF filed by plaintiff Mary S. Gimino. (Cho, Young) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/16 8:12 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF MARY S GIMINO (mj), PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/06 9:19 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-1972 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/05 3:24 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Wed 03/22 9:01 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Mary S. Gimino. (Cho, Young) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/20 2:42 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS2 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Request is GRANTED. (iv) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mary S. Gimino, (Cho, Young) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 2:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mary S. Gimino. (Cho, Young) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 2:41 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Mary S. Gimino. (Cho, Young) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Mary S. Gimino. (Attorney Young Chul Cho added to party Mary S. Gimino(pty:pla))(Cho, Young) |