Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01974 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1319 Clean Water Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Los Angeles Waterkeeper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/28 4:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER In Chambers by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case should have been closed on entry dated 10/25/2328 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
judgmentCV
Judgment - Consent
Thu 10/26 10:59 AM
CONSENT DECREE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: IT IS SO ORDERED. FINAL JUDGMENT. Upon approval and entry of this Consent Decree by the Court, this Consent Decree shall constitute a final judgment between the Plaintiff and Defendant. (bm) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Lodging
Mon 10/16 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Consent Decree; Request for Entry of Proposed Consent Decree re Notice of Settlement23(Barnes, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proposed consent decree | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/16 4:02 PM
Notice of No Objection to Proposed Consent Decree filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Barnes, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/03 9:50 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING ALL HEARINGS by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: In light of the parties' Notice of Settlement filed 9/21/23 (Dkt.23 ), the Court vacates all hearings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/22 11:00 AM
Notice filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. of Commencement of 45-day Review Period(Barnes, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proposed consent decree, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DOJ acknowledgment | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Settlement
Thu 09/21 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Tentative filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper.(Barnes, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - proposed consent decree | ||
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Sun 09/17 8:06 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 8/28/2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report by 9/8/2023, regarding Pretrial and Trial dates. (Dkt.19 ) Counsel shall file the report no later than 9/22/2023. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 10/6/2023 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the Court. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/01 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc., (Macdonald, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 08/29 12:30 PM
ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCES IN FILED DOCUMENT17 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (lom) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 08/28 2:00 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/22/2023 at 01:00. See Attached Order for Details. (hc) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 08/28 10:50 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/25 1:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc..(Macdonald, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 08/01 2:44 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 07/25 2:16 PM
ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS FROM CURRENT RESPONSE DATE13 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended from July 26, 2023, which was thirty (30) days after the initial deadline for filing a responsive pleading, to August 25, 2023, which will be a total of sixty (60) days after the initial deadline for filing a responsive pleading. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. (lom) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 07/20 2:56 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days),13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 07/20 12:11 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 25, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc..(Macdonald, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint | ||
Monday, June 19, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 06/19 2:50 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc. answer now due 7/26/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc..(Attorney James C. Macdonald added to party Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Macdonald, James) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 10:28 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-050) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01974-WLH-Ex. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/26 9:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. upon Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by James C. Macdonald, Counsel for Defendant. (Barnes, Anthony) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 11:34 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Eddie Kane Steel Products, Inc. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper, (Barnes, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 2:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Barnes, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 2:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Barnes, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34970130 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Attorney Anthony Michael Barnes added to party Los Angeles Waterkeeper(pty:pla))(Barnes, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NOI |