Peter Topolewski v. Experian Data Corp. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01976 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23VECV00260 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Experian Data Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Topolewski
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Terminated: 09/07/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 04/16 3:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Association of Counsel54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Association of Counsel not signed by Elliot Blut. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
attorney
Association of Counsel
Mon 04/15 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliot Blut, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiff Peter Topolewski. Filed by Plaintiff Peter Topolewski (Jahrmarkt, John) |