Lizeth Cherry v. QVC, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00461 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, CIVSB2223087 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
QVC, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Lizeth Cherry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/27 11:17 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE14 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all claims, causes of action, and parties. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 04/25 1:03 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)-(B) filed by Defendant QVC, Inc..(Skahan, Sharde) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/03 10:17 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on March 30, 2023. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 60 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for June 1, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on May 31, 2023. (aco) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Settlement
Thu 03/30 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16-15.7, AND REQUEST TO VACATE ALL CURRENTLY SET DATES filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/20 12:00 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 20, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) |
|
10 | 10
10
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/20 11:55 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00461 GW (SHKx). (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/16 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant QVC, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Declaration3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Declaration4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on March 16, 2023. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 3:26 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant QVC, Inc., identifying 1. Plaintiff Lizeth Cherry; 2. Defendant, QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Thu 03/16 3:25 PM
DECLARATION of Alicia Keane re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Thu 03/16 3:22 PM
DECLARATION of Sharde T. Skahan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 3:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2223087 Receipt No: ACACDC-34970397 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant QVC, Inc.. (Attorney Sharde Thomas Skahan added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft))(Skahan, Sharde) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 12:42 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff QVC, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 12/15/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 12:48 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant QVC, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 3/15/2023, attached to Skahan Decl. as Exhibit C. (jtil) |