Esperanza Asberry et al v. Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre West, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01981 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 21STCV36208 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brius Management Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donte Asberry
|
|
Defendant
Tessie Asberry
|
|
Defendant
Brius Management Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre West, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
Mohsen Mobasser
|
|
Defendant
Marie Faye Sorianosos
|
|
Plaintiff
Esperanza Asberry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Asberry, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candis Ashberry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Receipt
Tue 08/01 4:08 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV36208, acknowledged on 7/14/2023. (iv) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Mon 07/10 9:08 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) |
|
17 | 17
order
Dismiss Case Remand Case to State Court
Mon 07/10 9:06 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS7 ; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND10 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion to Remand is GRANTED and the Court directs the Clerk to REMAND this action to the Los Angeles Superior Court. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 06/07 10:48 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS7 AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND10 UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motions and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motions, noticed for hearing on June 12, 2023, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) |
|
Monday, May 29, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/29 2:36 PM
REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Defendants Brius Management Co., Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre West, LLC. (Zarmi, David) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 05/26 1:39 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Asberry, Samuel Asberry, Jr., Candis Ashberry. (Teets, Brian) |
|
Sunday, May 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sun 05/21 11:45 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court10 filed by Defendants Brius Management Co., Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre West, LLC. (Zarmi, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/10 11:13 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court10 and Motion to Dismiss Case7 is continued to 6/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/19 11:45 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court10 and Motion to Dismiss Case7 are continued for hearing on 6/5/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Tue 04/18 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs' Esperanza Asberry, Samuel Asberry, Jr., Candis Ashberry. Motion set for hearing on 5/22/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Teets, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/17 5:09 PM
Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Asberry, Samuel Asberry, Jr., Candis Ashberry. (Teets, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 04/17 5:07 PM
Plaintiffs' CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs' All Plaintiffs, (Teets, Brian) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 03/28 12:00 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Brius Management Company, Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre West, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Brius Management Company(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Centinela Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre West, LLC(pty:dft)) (Zarmi, David) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/22 5:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 5:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 8:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Brius Management Co., Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre West, LLC identifying Brius Management Co. as Corporate Parent. (Zarmi, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 8:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Brius Management Co., Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre West, LLC. (Zarmi, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 8:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV36208 Receipt No: ACACDC-34990178 - Fee: $402, filed by defendants Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre West, LLC, Brius Management Co.. (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Brius Management Co.(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre West, LLC(pty:dft))(Zarmi, David) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 03/22 5:38 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Asberry, Samuel Asberry, Jr., and Candis Ashberry in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/30/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |