Latanya Williams v. James E. Hundley et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00464 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
James E. Hundley
|
|
Plaintiff
Latanya Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/15 7:47 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) (Rule 4(m)), [i]f a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the courton motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiffmust dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. Because the Complaint in this matter was filed on 3/16/23, the defendant was required to have been served by 6/14/23. (Compl., Docket No.1 ). On August 4, 2023, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause (OSC) as to why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (OSC, Docket No.16 ). Instead of responding to the OSC, plaintiff filed an untimely proof of service on August 11, 2023, without leave of court to do so. (Proof of Service, Docket No.17 ). Therefore, pursuant to both Rule 4(m) and this Court's August 4, 2023 OSC, the proof of service filed on August 11, 2023, without leave of court is stricken, and the case is dismissed without prejudice. The May 16, 2023, OSC issued in this matter is discharged as MOOT. (OSC, Docket No.10 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 08/11 3:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams, upon Defendant James E. Hundley served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James E. Hundley, As Trustee Under the Hundley family Trust in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/04 4:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than August 11, 2023, why th is action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint (however, if the deadline to Answer has already passed, plaintiff(s) must also submit a Request for Default or Stipulation Extending Time to Answer); Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (FRCivP 41). See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
15 | 15
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/04 3:07 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc) |
|
14 | 14
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 08/04 2:43 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (hc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/04 2:41 PM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Tue 05/23 2:09 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williamsto Order to Show Cause10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Fri 05/19 4:23 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-036) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-00464-JGB(KKx). (ap) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 05/16 3:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/23/2023. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 4:57 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:50 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant James E. Hundley. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:48 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:47 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 4:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 4:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 4:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34971302 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Latanya Williams(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |