Christopher Shane Rivera v. Jeffrey Macomber
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00463 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:31 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgment No. 11, | ||
Att: 2 Lodgment No. 12, | ||
Att: 3 Lodgment No. 13, | ||
Att: 4 Lodgment No. 14, | ||
Att: 5 Lodgment No. 15, | ||
Att: 6 Lodgment No. 16, | ||
Att: 7 Lodgment No. 17, | ||
Att: 8 Lodgment No. 18, | ||
Att: 9 Lodgment No. 19, | ||
Att: 10 Lodgment No. 20, | ||
Att: 11 Lodgment No. 21, | ||
Att: 12 Lodgment No. 22, | ||
Att: 13 Lodgment No. 23, | ||
Att: 14 Lodgment No. 24, | ||
Att: 15 Lodgment No. 25, | ||
Att: 16 Lodgment No. 26, | ||
Att: 17 Lodgment No. 27, | ||
Att: 18 Lodgment No. 28, | ||
Att: 19 Lodgment No. 29, | ||
Att: 20 Lodgment No. 30, | ||
Att: 21 Lodgment No. 31, | ||
Att: 22 Lodgment No. 32, | ||
Att: 23 Lodgment No. 33, | ||
Att: 24 Lodgment No. 34, | ||
Att: 25 Lodgment No. 35, | ||
Att: 26 Lodgment No. 36 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:22 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgment No. 3 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Lodgment No. 4, | ||
Att: 3 Lodgment No.5, | ||
Att: 4 Lodgment No. 6, | ||
Att: 5 Lodgment No. 7, | ||
Att: 6 Lodgment No. 8, | ||
Att: 7 Lodgment No. 9, | ||
Att: 8 Lodgment No. 10 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:16 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 3 Part 1 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:14 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 2 Part 5 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:10 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 2 Part 4 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:07 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 2 Part 3 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:04 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 2 Part 2 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 11:02 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 2 Part 1 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 10:58 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 1 Part 2 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 03/08 10:54 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 26(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgement No. 1 Part 1 | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 03/07 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Jeffrey Macomber. (Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Enlargement of Time to File
Mon 01/29 11:30 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: granting24 APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File. For good cause shown, a response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is not due until March 7, 2024. Petitioner Rivera may file an Opposition, if any, to the response within thirty (30) days after the date of service thereof. No further extensions will be granted. (et) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Enlargement of Time to File Document
Fri 01/26 5:13 PM
APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Jeffrey Macomber. (Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 01/17 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to P. O. Box 4490, Lancaster, CA 93539. Filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivera. (shb) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 01/03 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to Christopher Shane Rivera CDC AF2999, PO Box 4490, Lancaster, CA. 93539. Filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivera. (et) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Enlargement of Time to File
Thu 12/21 6:06 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: granting20 APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File. For good cause shown, a response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is not due until February 5, 2024. Petitioner Rivera may file an Opposition, if any, to the response within thirty (30) days after the date of service thereof. (et) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Enlargement of Time to File Document
Thu 12/21 4:03 PM
APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Jeffrey Macomber. (Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Wed 11/22 5:34 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-154 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the Creation of Calendar of Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin to the calendar of Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 5:23-cv-00463 SSS(DTB) absent further order of the Court. (rn) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Enlargement of Time to File
Mon 11/20 7:14 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin: Granting17 REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File. For good cause shown, a response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is not due until January 3, 2024. Petitioner Rivera may file an Opposition, if any, to the response within thirty (30) days after the date of service thereof. (et) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Enlargement of Time to File Document
Mon 11/20 1:16 PM
REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File Response filed by Respondent Jeffrey Macomber. (Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the California Attorney General
Fri 11/17 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Adrian R. Contreras on behalf of Respondent Jeffrey Macomber. (Attorney Adrian Ramon Contreras added to party Jeffrey Macomber(pty:res))(Contreras, Adrian) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition
Mon 11/06 10:54 AM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. IT IS ORDERED that Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance. Respondent shall file and serve an Answer to the Petition not later than 12/18/2023. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 12/3/2023. (es) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment.Petition.Part1, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment.Petition.Part2 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stay Case (to Lift)
Fri 11/03 2:32 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin Granting13 MOTION to Lift Stay on Case: On October 30, 2023, Petitioner filed this instant Motion to Lift Rhines Stay and Abeyance ("Motion"). (Dkt. 13.) Petitioner informs the Court that state court proceedings have ended and that proceedings in this Court should resume. (Id.) The Court hereby GRANTS Petitioner's Motion. The stay previously entered in this action is lifted. The Court will issue a separate order requiring Respondent to appear and respond to the Petition. (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay Case (to Lift)
Thu 11/02 10:07 AM
MOTION to Lift Rhines Stay and Abeyance; Declaration of Christopher Shane Rivera of Exhaustion of State Remedies filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivera. (es) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/20 5:25 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivera. (et) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Mon 07/31 6:32 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-110 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the Creation of Calendar of Magistrate Judge A. Joel Ricklin, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to the calendar of Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin for all further proceedings. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 5:23-cv-00463 SSS(AJR). (rn) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/18 11:16 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivera (es) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/27 10:49 AM
Petitioner's Notice of Filing State Habeas filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivera. (es) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Abeyance Stay Order (other)
Thu 05/04 3:46 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to Stay Petition Pursuant to Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269 (2005) [Dkt. No. 4] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Petitioner's Motion and STAYS this action, on the following terms and conditions: No later than July 19, 2023, Petitioner shall file a status report in this Court informing the Court of his progress in exhausting his state court remedies. Petitioner shall file further status reports every sixty days following his first status report until the California Supreme Court issues its decision. Granting4 MOTION for Abeyance and Stay [See document for additional information.] (es) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Mon 03/20 11:53 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (HABEAS)2 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Fri 03/17 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to a clerical error, Petitioner's last name (Rivera) was misspelled when the matter was opened. The lastname will be corrected. (sh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Abeyance Stay Order (other)
Thu 03/16 5:02 PM
MOTION FOR STAY AND ABEYANCE PURSUANT TO RHINES, filed by petitioner Christopher Shane Rivers. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party
Thu 03/16 4:57 PM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Christopher Shane Rivers. The Petitioner does not consent. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Thu 03/16 4:56 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by petitioner Christopher Shane Rivers. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Thu 03/16 4:55 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Christopher Shane Rivers. (ghap) |