Jamie DeLorme v. Big Think Capital, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-mc-00037 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Show Cause Hearing - optional html form
Fri 11/17 5:17 PM
SEALED - MINUTES OF SEALED - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY JOHNY RODRIGUEZ SHOULD NOT BE ADJUDGED IN CONTEMPT17 (bm) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 10/23 3:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Big Think Capital, Inc., re Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,17 served on October 22, 2023. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Show Cause
Thu 10/19 9:04 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, DKT. 1 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Rodriguez is ORDERED to appear on November 17, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. in the Courtroom of the Honorable Fernando Aenlle-Rocha, U.S. District Judge, First Street Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Courtroom 6B, 6th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90012, to show cause why he should not be adjudged in contempt by reason of the facts certified in this order. Defendant is directed to serve this order on Rodriguez at his last known address no later than three days from the service of this order on them; they must file proof of service with the Court within twenty-four hours. Defendant shall personally serve the order if at all possible. Granting12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause. [See document for further information.] (es) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 10/12 4:53 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On September 27, 2023, Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. filed an Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Why Non-Party Witness Johny Rodriguez Should not be held in Civil Contempt ("Application"). Dkt.12 . The court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to investigate whether further contempt proceedings are warranted and, if so, to certify facts to this court. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(e)(6). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 09/28 3:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Big Think Capital, Inc., re Declaration (Motion related),,13 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt 12 served on 9/28/2023. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/28 2:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. designating Daniel J. Spielfogel as local counsel8 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Wed 09/27 3:50 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel J. Spielfogel In support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt 12 filed by Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc..(Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: 8/16/2022 letter from defendant's counsel to non-party witness, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Subpoena and Affidavit of Service, served on 10/31/2022, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: 12/12/2022 letter from defendant's counsel to non-party witness, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Ethics Complaint documents received by defendant's counsel, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5: 1/9/2023 letter from defendant's counsel to non-party witness | ||
12 | 12
motion
Show Cause
Wed 09/27 3:32 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt filed by defendant Big Think Capital, Inc.. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 04/26 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, DKT. 1 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: re: MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District,1 . The Court finds this matter suitable for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); Local Rule 7-15. For the reasons set forth below, Defendants Motion is DENIED. [See document for details.] (es) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 03/30 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/17/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34976749)8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Applicant failed to list admission to MN state bar. Only listed IA. (lt) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/29 1:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 served on 3/28/2023. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 03/29 1:41 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/17/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34976749) filed by Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc.. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/29 11:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: RE MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District,1 . PURSUANT TO JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS : ORDER RE: REFERRAL OF MOTION OF BIG THINK CAPITAL, INC. TO COMPEL JOHNY RODRIGUEZ TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGO A. ROCCONI. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 4:51 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34976749)3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34976749)3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed, as to local counsel. (sbou) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/17 1:38 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew R. Burton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34976749) filed by Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc.. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/16 6:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc., re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District,1 served on 3/16/2023. (Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District
Thu 03/16 5:56 PM
MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-34972269 - Fee: $49, filed by Defendant Big Think Capital, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel J Spielfogel added to party Big Think Capital, Inc. (pty:dft))(Spielfogel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew R. Burton, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order |