Jonathan Perry v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01986 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2023 3:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Whole Foods Market IP, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Perry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 03/30 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Perry. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Li, Jingxin) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 10:43 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 as to Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., Whole Foods Market IP, Inc. (iv) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/24 4:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Perry. (Li, Jingxin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Perry, (Li, Jingxin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/24 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/24 12:18 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 12:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 4:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JONATHAN PERRY. (Li, Jingxin) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35013760 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff JONATHAN PERRY. (Attorney Jingxin Li added to party JONATHAN PERRY(pty:pla))(Li, Jingxin) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/21 8:52 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. cc: jasonli@jasonlilaw.com (car) |