Maurice Moore v. Translink Logistics Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01992 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Maurice Moore v. Translink Logistics Inc., 56-02023-00574739-CU- |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Translink Logistics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 09/21 2:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On September 19, 2023, Plaintiff Maurice Moore and Defendant Translink Logistics Inc. filed a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, dismissing the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)19 . Having considered the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the action with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 09/19 12:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Case Settled filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc..(Knaack, Joel) |
|
18 | 18
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 09/19 8:36 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice (Other)16 (Notice of Dismissal) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 09/18 2:12 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1) Defendant using Plaintiff notice of Voluntary dismissal form. Format not applicable in that this Removing defendant filed an answer on 3/22/23. Filer must prepare proper formatted documents as appropriate and submit a separate proposed order as an attachment depending on the format being used. Incorrect event does not provide the relief sought. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/15 12:46 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc.. (Knaack, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/23 3:22 PM
ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, ANDCONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2024 01:00 PM ; Jury Trial set for 8/27/2024 08:30 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 8/9/2024 at 01:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)
Tue 05/23 3:12 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 07/05/2024. (tf) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/23 3:11 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the June 2, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Wed 05/17 9:27 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Maurice Moore..(Trauben, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/27 4:54 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Sunday, March 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sun 03/26 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maurice Moore, identifying Maurice Moore and TransLink Logistics Inc.. (Attorney Michael Alan Trauben added to party Maurice Moore(pty:pla))(Trauben, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 03/22 2:04 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joel Christopher Knaack counsel for Defendant Translink Logistics Inc.. Adding Joel C. Knaack as counsel of record for Translink Logistics Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc.. (Knaack, Joel) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 03/22 1:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc..(Knaack, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:26 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 4:19 PM
and Notice CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc., identifying Dmytro Svetikov; Progressive Select Insurance Co.; Translink Logistics, Inc.. (Knaack, Joel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 4:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc.. (Knaack, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2023 00574739-CU-PO-VTA with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 03/17/2023, receipt number ACACDC-34974116), filed by Defendant Translink Logistics Inc.. (Attorney Joel Christopher Knaack added to party Translink Logistics Inc. (pty:dft))(Knaack, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Interested Parties | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 3:58 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Maurice Moore in Ventura Superior Court on 1/19/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |