Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. California Testing & Inspections, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01994 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
California Testing & Inspections, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Contract Administration Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Workers' Compensation Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 07/25 3:17 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: Plaintiffs, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Workers' Compensation Trust, and Contract Administration Fund, shall recover from Defendant, California Testing & Inspections, Inc., a California corporation, the principal amount of $403,479.74, plus pre-judgment and post-judgment interest thereon at the rate of 8% per annum from June 15, 2023, until paid in full. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Judgment
Tue 07/25 11:14 AM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to California Testing & Inspections, Inc., a California corporation filed by plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust.(Jung, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 07/19 1:29 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Y Jung counsel for Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust. Adding Michael Y. Jung as counsel of record for Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, et al.. (Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Contract Administration Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Workers' Compensation Trust(pty:pla))(Jung, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/18 10:29 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than July 28, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 05/25 10:14 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Workers' Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, upon Defendant California Testing & Inspections, Inc. served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Danny Pasos, Employee in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Thompson, Andrew) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
10
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/20 11:53 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 10:56 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant California Testing & Inspections, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust, (Thompson, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 11:20 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust. (Thompson, Andrew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 11:19 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Workers' Compensation Trust. (Thompson, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34975099 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Workers' Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust. (Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Contract Administration Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Quinn Thompson added to party Workers' Compensation Trust(pty:pla))(Thompson, Andrew) |