Yanfen Mai v. United States Citizeship and Immigration Services et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02001 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center
850 S St
Lincoln, NE 68508 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rena Bitter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa K Heller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yanfen Mai
7661 Marsh Ave
Rosemead, CA 91770 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 07/12 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Yanfen Mai. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Shu, Han) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 06/26 10:44 AM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OFAPPLICATION13 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court STAYS the action until November 14, 2023. The court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report on the earlier of November 7, 2023 or seven (7) days after USCIS issues a determination regarding Plaintiff's Application. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Stay Case
Wed 06/21 5:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of application filed by DEFENDANTS Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken, Lisa K Heller, Ur M. Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Canter, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order to stay | ||
Saturday, June 17, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sat 06/17 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 05/24 6:29 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Lisa K Heller, Antony J. Blinken, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center, Ur M. Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Rena Bitter.(Canter, Nancy) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Tue 05/02 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nancy K Canter on behalf of Defendants Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken, Lisa K Heller, Ur M. Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party Rena Bitter(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party Lisa K Heller(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy K Canter added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Canter, Nancy) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 04/13 5:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yanfen Mai, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Shu, Han) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:29 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:05 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken, Lisa K Heller, Ur M. Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service Nebraska Service Center and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 11:35 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by plaintiff Yanfen Mai.(Shu, Han) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment #1 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 11:32 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Shu, Han) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 11:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yanfen Mai. (Shu, Han) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:29 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34975259 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Yanfen Mai. (Attorney Han Shu added to party Yanfen Mai(pty:pla))(Shu, Han) |