Guri Gonzalez v. Andrew Meselson
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02002 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Andrew Meselson
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Guri Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/09 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/12 4:12 PM
ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS,11 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. or the foregoing reasons, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction and dismisses Plaintiff's state law causes of action (claims two through five). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Fri 04/07 10:16 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Guri Gonzalezto Order to Show Cause,,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 03/24 2:44 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within 14 days of this order. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 4:38 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (kmh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Andrew Meselson. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:46 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 11:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 11:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 11:33 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Guri Gonzalez. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-34975355 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Guri Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |