Hanna v. Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00415 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Nevada District Court, A-23-865599-C |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Hanna
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Delta Faucet Company
Registerd Agent CT Corporation System 334 North Senate Ave.
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case
Tue 02/27 3:50 PM
ORDER granting24 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, with each party bearing its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/26 12:25 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Bashor, Karen) (dismissal) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order
Wed 11/15 10:31 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.22 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 4/15/2024 . Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/18/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation
Mon 11/13 4:32 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and Proposed Order re20 Stipulation by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Nelson, Kimberly) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order
Tue 09/19 12:54 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.20 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 1/16/2024 . Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation
Fri 09/15 3:33 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re18 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Nelson, Kimberly) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 05/03 2:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/17/2023. Motions due by 12/18/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Wed 05/03 2:52 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (AMMi) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 05/02 12:21 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC.. (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/25 3:42 PM
DECLARATION of THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT DELTA FAUCET COMPANYS FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re15 Answer to Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Defendant Delta Faucet Company.. (Thomas, Melanie) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Tue 04/25 3:36 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,, filed by Delta Faucet Company.(Thomas, Melanie) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 04/20 9:59 AM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer8 Third Party Complaint. Delta Faucet Company answer due 4/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/19 3:00 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC.. (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Tue 04/18 4:19 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline to Respond re8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,, by ThirdParty Defendant Delta Faucet Company. (Thomas, Melanie) (extend) (answer) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/30 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC re9 Proposed Summons to be issued,10 Summons Issued,8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,. Delta Faucet Company served on 3/28/2023. (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 7:32 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delta Faucet Company re8 Third Party Complaint. (KF) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Fri 03/24 1:32 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint
Fri 03/24 1:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/3/2023., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/8/2023.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Delta Faucet Company by Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. filed by Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC.(Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kevin Hanna. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Leavitt, Johnathan) |
|
6 | 6
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Mon 03/20 7:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/20/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/4/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 12:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 12:06 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Fri 03/17 12:05 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC..(Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Fri 03/17 12:02 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada District Court, Case Number A-23-865599-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7239122) by Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/27/2023. (Nelson, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/20 7:24 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF) |
||
order
Standing Order
Mon 03/20 7:24 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |