Lorna Taylor et al v. R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00483 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02022-01295797-CU-PO-CJC |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Liggett Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vector Group, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Francesca Bitagliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorna Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Wilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Wilbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dale Wilbert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
order
Continue
Wed 04/17 4:10 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting38 R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company's APPLICATION for Continuance of Trial and All Related Dates [Dkt. 38]. NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Discovery to close on, and all discovery motions to be heard by, 11/29/2024. Motions due by 1/27/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/13/2024. Trial to begin on 4/8/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. Pretrial Conference on 3/31/2025 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (twdb) Modified on 4/17/2024 (twdb) |
|
40 | 40
respm
Joinder (Motion Related)
Wed 04/17 12:24 PM
JOINDER in APPLICATION to Continue Trial from October 8, 2024 to April 8, 202538 and Notice of Adoption filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC. (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Non-Opposition to Document (not a motion)
Tue 04/16 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION APPLICATION to Continue Trial from October 8, 2024 to April 8, 202538 filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Geise, Steven) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Continue
Fri 04/05 2:59 PM
APPLICATION to Continue Trial from October 8, 2024 to April 8, 2025 filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. Application set for hearing on 5/6/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Geise, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer Kane, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Mon 01/08 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Robert Bosslet counsel for Defendant Liggett Group, LLC. Changing address to 101 California Street, Suite 3950, San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC. (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Thu 10/05 12:35 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel,,34 filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Luper, Ramanda) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/27 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Reynoldss First Set of Discovery 34 filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Geise, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Compel
Wed 09/13 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Reynoldss First Set of Discovery filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick.(Geise, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven N. Geise, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Disclosure
Fri 05/26 9:46 AM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Thu 05/25 11:40 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp) |
|
31 | 31
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 05/25 11:39 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 5/30/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 7/29/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 6/13/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 10/8/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/18 12:44 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10, filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company.. (Geise, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/17 4:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting28 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer C. Kane APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, designating Ramanda R. Luper as local counsel. (twdb) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 05/05 2:14 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer C. Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35263467) filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Luper, Ramanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 05/03 7:59 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC.(Bosslet, Robert) |
|
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 05/03 3:30 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company.(Geise, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 04/19 12:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying in Substantial Part Defendants R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Liggett Group, LLC'S Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.13 ). Plaintiffs FAC is dismissed as to the Sibling Plaintiffs only. Reynolds and Liggett shall file an answer to the FAC by May 3, 2023. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/19 8:31 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting20 Non-Resident Attorney Giselle G. Manseur APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Robert W. Bosslet as local counsel. (twdb) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/17 2:57 PM
ORDER AMENDING AS TO VECTOR GROUP LTD. INC. THE 03/24/2023 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS LIGGETT GROUP LLC AND VECTOR GROUP LTD.S TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation21 . The April 14, 2023 deadline for Vector Group Ltd., Inc. to respond to the First Amended Complaint as set forth in the 03/24/2023 Order (D.E. 15) is vacated as to Defendant Vector Group Ltd., Inc. only. Vector Group Ltd., Inc. is not required to respond the First Amended Complaint until Plaintiffs properly serve it with process in this action. (twdb) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Joinder (Motion Related)
Fri 04/14 3:28 PM
JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 Defendant Liggett Group LLC's Adoption of and Joinder in Defendant R.J. Reynolds's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC. (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
21 | 21
stip
Amend/Correct
Fri 04/14 3:19 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Amend as to Vector Group Ltd., Inc. the Court's 03/24/2023 Order Extending Time for Defendants Liggett Group LLC and Vector Group Ltd.'s to Respond to First Amended Complaint Order Extending Answer Due Deadline,15 filed by Defendant Vector Group, Ltd..(Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 04/12 10:59 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Giselle G. Manseur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Liggett Group, LLC, Vector Group, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35123931) filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC, Vector Group, Ltd.. (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 04/10 4:19 PM
REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Geise, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/03 4:13 PM
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 filed by Plaintiff Lorna Taylor. (Chambers, Gary) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/31 2:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Kelly Anne C. Luther APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Liggett Group LLC and Vector Group Ltd., designating Robert W. Bosslet as local counsel. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Appearance
Tue 03/28 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ramanda R Luper on behalf of Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company (Attorney Ramanda R Luper added to party R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company(pty:dft))(Luper, Ramanda) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 03/24 4:15 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants Liggett Group LLC and Vector Group LTD., to Respond to First Amended Complaint (30 days or less),10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendants Liggett Group LLC and Vector Group Ltd., Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint on or before April 14, 2023. (twdb) |
|
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (dgo) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 03/24 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Geise, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven N. Geise, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 03/23 7:20 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly Anne Luther to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Liggett Group, LLC, Vector Group, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35014523) filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC, Vector Group, Ltd.. (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liggett Group, LLC, Vector Group, Ltd., identifying VGR Holding LLC, Vector Group Ltd. Shareholders. (Bosslet, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/23 4:53 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vector Group, Ltd. answer now due 4/14/2023; Liggett Group, LLC answer now due 4/14/2023, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Vector Group, Ltd.; Liggett Group, LLC.(Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Thu 03/23 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert W Bosslet on behalf of Defendants Liggett Group, LLC, Vector Group, Ltd. (Attorney Robert W Bosslet added to party Vector Group, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Bosslet, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:02 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 2:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 03/17/2023. (Geise, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, (Geise, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 2:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company identifying British American Tobacco, p.l.c. as Corporate Parent. (Geise, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 2:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Geise, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022 01295797-CU-PO-CJC with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 03/17/2023, receipt number 34976186), filed by defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Attorney Steven Nicholas Geise added to party R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company(pty:dft))(Geise, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Defendant Liggett Group LLCs Consent To Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Defendant Vector Group Ltd., Incs Consent To Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Steven N. Geise, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration of Kelly Anne Luther | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 3:41 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Liggett Group, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Vector Group, Ltd., Robert Dale Wilbert., filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Lynch, Lorna Taylor, Christian Wilbert, John Wilbert.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/06/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/17 3:44 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Liggett Group, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Vector Group, Ltd. amending Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Francesca Bitagliano, Robert Dale Wilbert, Kimberly Lynch, Lorna Taylor, Christian Wilbert, John Wilbert[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/16/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/17 3:47 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Francesca Bitagliano, Robert Dale Wilbert, Kimberly Lynch, Lorna Taylor, Christian Wilbert, John Wilbert, upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/06/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 10 EXHIBIT G TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/17 3:49 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Francesca Bitagliano, Robert Dale Wilbert, Kimberly Lynch, Lorna Taylor, Christian Wilbert, John Wilbert, upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 03/06/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 10 EXHIBIT G TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/17 3:52 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Francesca Bitagliano, Robert Dale Wilbert, Kimberly Lynch, Lorna Taylor, Christian Wilbert, John Wilbert, upon Defendant Brown & Williamson U.S.A. Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 03/08/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 10 EXHIBIT G TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/17 3:54 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Francesca Bitagliano, Robert Dale Wilbert, Kimberly Lynch, Lorna Taylor, Christian Wilbert, John Wilbert, upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 03/08/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 10 EXHIBIT G TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |