McDonald v. Trans Union LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00416 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Jan 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 5:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie McDonald
9004 In Vogue Ct.
Las Vegas, NV 89149 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/16 10:04 AM
ORDER Granting47 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Trans Union LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
47 | 47
motion
Stipulation
Fri 01/12 2:40 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice of Trans Union LLC by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Pietrzak, Kyle) (dismissal) |
|
minord
Minute Order
Fri 01/12 1:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/12/2024. Plaintiff Valerie McDonald filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of her claims against Trans Union LLC 45 . But to dismiss an action after the defendant has filed an answer, a plaintiff must file "a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared" or move for a court order dismissing the case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The parties are advised that this case remains open until they comply with the magistrate judge's order to file appropriate dismissal paperwork by February 6, 2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MH) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/09 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal against Defendant Trans Union LLC. by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. (ALZ) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/06 11:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/6/2023. ORDER denying26 Motion. The authorities cited by Plaintiff are inapposite to Ms. Brown's and Ms. Rigo's authority to serve as Defendant's attorneys. Both Ms. Brown and Ms. Rigo are active members of the State Bar of Nevada and therefore are authorized to practice law. See NRS 7.285; LR IA 11-1. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Because Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees did not comply with Local Rules IC 2-2(b) and (c), this request is also DENIED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS) |
||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/06 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/6/2023. ORDER denying38 Motion to Strike and granting40 Motion. Defendant has demonstrated excusable neglect under FRCP 6(b)(1). As such, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 38) and GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Leave to File its Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash (ECF No. 40). Defendant's response will be considered in the Court's determination of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash (ECF No. 28). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 12/06 5:43 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Pre-settlement conference status conference held on 12/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Pla: Valerie McDonald, pro se ; Def Counsel: Kyle Pietrzak & Bernadette Rigo (local counsel) ; Time of Hearing: 3:35 p.m.-3:41 p.m. ; (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference Order on Motion to Quash
Wed 12/06 5:51 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 12/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Pla: Valerie McDonald, pro se ; Def Counsel: Kyle Pietrzak ; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m. -12:33 p.m. ; In addition to counsel, the following person was present: Donald Wagner, Specialist III in the Litigation Support Department of Trans Union LLC for Defendant. The Court heard presentations from counsel and Plaintiff and met with each side in caucuses. Offers and counteroffers were exchanged. A settlement was reached. The parties are to execute settlement documents, complete settlement, and file dismissal paperwork by 2/6/2024. If a stipulated dismissal has not been filed by that date, the parties must instead file a joint status report stating what is impeding settlement and how or if the Court can assist.Further, the Court finds as moot28 Motion to Quash. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS) |
||
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/06 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File its Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Quash Subpoena Out of Time re34 Response by Defendant Trans Union LLC. Responses due by 11/20/2023.(Pietrzak, Kyle) (misc) (nondispositive) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration | ||
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Reply
Fri 11/03 2:20 PM
REPLY to Response to26 Motion by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. (CT) Modified on 11/3/2023 to update file date. (RGDG) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Motion Strike
Fri 11/03 2:18 PM
MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response To Motion To Quash Subpoena And All Moving Papers Filed In Support Due To Untimely Filing. by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. Responses due by 11/17/2023. (CT) (answer) Modified on 11/3/2023 to update file date. (RGDG) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Thu 11/02 9:11 AM
ORDER setting Settlement Conference. Pre-Settlement Telephonic Conference set for 12/5/2023 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Settlement Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B by Zoom videoconference before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Exhibit
Wed 11/01 3:29 PM
EXHIBIT A and EXHIBIT B to34 Response by Defendant Trans Union LLC.. (Pietrzak, Kyle) |
|
35 | 35
respm
Response
Wed 11/01 10:36 AM
RESPONSE to26 Motion by Defendant Trans Union LLC. Replies due by 11/8/2023. (Pietrzak, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response
Tue 10/31 1:29 PM
RESPONSE to28 Motion to Quash by Defendant Trans Union LLC. Replies due by 11/7/2023. (Pietrzak, Kyle) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Fri 10/27 3:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No.32 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No.32 and be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. The document should also be filed as a motion for attorneys' fees. (no image attached) (CJS) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response
Thu 10/26 4:01 PM
RESPONSE to26 Motion by Defendant Trans Union LLC. Replies due by 11/2/2023.(Pietrzak, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence | ||
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Unopposed Motion
Wed 10/25 12:37 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.29 Motion for Referral to Magistrate for Settlement Conference and Stay of Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. The current discovery and pretrial deadlines in this case are stayed until thirty-days (30) days following the conclusion of the settlement conference. See order for additional specifics. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
5
pgs
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/18 3:33 PM
ORDER granting27 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle Pietrzak for Trans Union LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Bernadette Rigo. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/18/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Unopposed Motion
Tue 10/17 2:59 PM
Joint UNOPPOSED MOTION Joint Motion For Referral To Magistrate For Settlement Conference And Stay Of Discovery And Pretrial Deadlines by Defendant Trans Union LLC. Responses due by 10/31/2023.(Rigo, Bernadette) (presiding) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Motion Quash
Mon 10/16 3:32 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. Responses due by 10/30/2023.(ALZ) |
|
Att: 1 Request | ||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Fri 10/13 5:07 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kyle Pietrzak and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bernadette Rigo (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BNVDC-7459535) by Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Rigo, Bernadette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Courts Petitioner was admitted to practice | ||
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 10/12 2:49 PM
MOTION to Show Authority/ Hearing Request on Matter by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. Responses due by 10/26/2023. (CAH) (misc) (presiding) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice Other
Wed 10/11 2:54 PM
NOTICE Notice of Appearance by Trans Union LLC.. (Rigo, Bernadette) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Terminate Motion Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/26 8:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/26/2023. ORDER denying22 Motion for Attorney to Show Authority. First, Plaintiff has not adequately cited points and authorities justifying her request. She complains that an attorney licensed in the State of Texas has sent her discovery requests in this action in federal court raising federal claims. There is no requirement that a party sending discovery requests be licensed to practice law in the state that the district court is in. A paralegal may send discovery requests on behalf of a client. Mr. Pietrzak has not "appeared" in this action pursuant to the Local Rules for the District of Nevada, and therefore is not required to seek permission to mail discovery requests to Plaintiff, were he to file pleadings or appear at a hearing on behalf of a client, then he would first comply with the Local Rules. Second, Plaintiff cites no factual or legal authority that "Sarai L Thornton" was hired without authority. Further, the full faith and credit clause does not require the Court to apply the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure in this action to a Nevada attorney practicing law in the Federal District of Nevada. The motion is DENIED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/21 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for22 Motion by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. (CAH) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 09/11 3:29 PM
MOTION for Attorney to Show Authority by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. Responses due by 9/25/2023. (AMMi) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/28 12:25 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC.(Brown, Sarai) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/28 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for19 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. (ALZ) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 08/17 12:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Trans Union LLC by Valerie McDonald. No changes to parties. (ALZ) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 08/09 10:22 AM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation
Mon 08/07 2:41 PM
STIPULATION [order] for Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Brown, Sarai) (other) (attorney) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/04 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/4/2023. ORDER granting15 Motion; Re:15 Motion. Presently before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (ECF No. 15). Though the time for doing so has passed no response in opposition has been filed. Therefore, good cause being found and in accordance with Local Rule 7-2(d), Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint no later than August 18, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BXS) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/12 9:23 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. Responses due by 7/24/2023. (ALZ) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Tue 06/20 2:14 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (AMMi) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 06/20 10:44 AM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 12/12/2023. Motions due by 1/11/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 06/15 4:52 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Trans Union LLC.. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 05/01 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., for Trans Union LLC added. (Bonds, Kurt) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/01 4:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/11/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/15/2023.(Bonds, Kurt) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 04/12 10:43 AM
ORDER Granting8 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Trans Union LLC answer due 5/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Mon 04/10 9:40 AM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to re1 Complaint by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bonds, Kurt) (extend) (answer) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/04 2:14 PM
DECLARATION of Service re3 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. (JQC) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/30 1:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Valerie McDonald. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (JQC) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Tue 03/28 1:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Valerie McDonald. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/4/2023. (no image attached) (EDS) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Fri 03/17 3:39 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 3:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trans Union LLC. (JQC) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents
Fri 03/17 3:33 PM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Valerie McDonald. (JQC) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Trans Union LLC by Valerie McDonald. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/27/2023. Proof of service due by 6/15/2023. (JQC) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt # 200003160 | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 03/17 1:06 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF) |