Natalie Cole v. Fleur Du Mal LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02020 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV02489 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Anna Elinsky
|
|
Defendant
Fleur Du Mal LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Cole
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Tue 08/15 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Natalie Cole (Onwaeze, Ogochukwu) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 08/14 11:55 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than August 16, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed in light of the parties notice of settlement [ECF No. 14] and subsequent failure to comply with the Courts Order to file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement [ECF No. 15]. As an alternative to a written response by Plaintiff, the Court will accept: a notice of dismissal or a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a response on or before the date upon which a response by Plaintiff is due. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kmh) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 06/14 2:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On June 12, 2023, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement 26 . The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefor, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated. (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement no later than 45 days from the date of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. (yl) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Settlement
Mon 06/12 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Fleur Du Mal LLC. (Drapalski, Anet) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 05/03 4:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO FILE A REMAND MOTION BY SIXTY (60) DAYS by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Defendant's time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint will be continued by sixty (60) days, up to and including June 30, 2023. Plaintiff's time to file a remand action is extended to June 30, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) Modified on 5/3/2023 (yl) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 04/28 4:02 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 6/30/23 re Amended Complaint/Petition11 filed by Defendant Fleur Du Mal LLC.(Drapalski, Anet) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and to File a Remand Motion by (60) Days | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 04/17 2:45 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by PLAINTIFF Natalie Cole(Onwaeze, Ogochukwu) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 03/31 10:41 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 03/22 2:52 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fleur Du Mal LLC answer now due 4/24/2023, filed by Defendant Fleur Du Mal LLC.(Drapalski, Anet) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:35 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 03/17 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FLEUR DU MAL LLC. Related Case(s): None (Drapalski, Anet) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 3:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FLEUR DU MAL LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Drapalski, Anet) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FLEUR DU MAL LLC, identifying Plaintiff, Natalie Cole; Defendant, Fleur du Mal LLC; and Jennifer Zuccarini. (Drapalski, Anet) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FLEUR DU MAL LLC. (Drapalski, Anet) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV02489 Receipt No: ACACDC-34978009 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FLEUR DU MAL LLC. (Attorney Anet Medeli Castro Drapalski added to party FLEUR DU MAL LLC(pty:dft))(Drapalski, Anet) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Anet C. Drapalski in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jennifer Zuccarini in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 16 pgs State Court Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 12:40 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Fleur Du Mal LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Natalie Cole. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/6/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |