Nicole Mejia v. Jose Rendon et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sherilyn Peace Garnett |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02003 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, 22WCUD02688 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Maria S. Grain
13720 Valley blvd Spc 12
La Puente, CA 91746 |
|
Defendant
Jose Rendon
|
|
Defendant
Maria Rendon
|
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Mejia
2131 West San Bernardino Road, Spc.72
West Covina, CA 91790 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Receipt
Mon 04/03 3:19 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 22WCUD02688, acknowledged on 3/29/2023. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 2:54 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/22 2:51 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS3 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Request is DENIED. This case is REMANDED to state court. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 8:35 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:59 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/17 2:34 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Maria S. Grain. (sh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 2:28 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maria S. Grain, (sh) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 22WCUD02688 with copy of summons and complaint.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/12/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED] Case assigned to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero., filed by Defendant Maria S. Grain. (sh) (sh) |
|
Att: 1 (3/17/2023) Civil Cover Sheet |