Ricardo Roybal Olivarez v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02015 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles, 23AHCV00288 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Roybal Olivarez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Mon 07/03 3:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order of Dismissal (JS6) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. re: Notice (Other)16 . (smo) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/03 1:45 PM
Notice Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Roybal Olivarez. Joint Notice of Settlement (Yu, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Wed 05/10 9:44 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 22, 2023. (smo) |
|
14 | 14
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 05/10 9:40 AM
ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2024 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/26/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/03 4:09 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on May 15, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 04/27 2:50 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.. (Wolf, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/21 10:09 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:01 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:42 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:42 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 3:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, re Jury Demand4 , Notice (Other)5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 3/17/23. (Wolf, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/17 3:16 PM
Notice of re-filing state court answer filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Wolf, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A | ||
4 | 4
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 03/17 2:57 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.. (Wolf, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 2:52 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC identifying Jaguar Land Rover Limited, which is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Holdings Limited, which is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, which is a subsidiary of TML Holdings Pte. Ltd., which is a subsidiary of Tata Motors Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Wolf, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 2:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Wolf, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CA, case number 23AHCV00288 Receipt No: ACACDC-34977382 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attorney Matthew C. Wolf added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Wolf, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 9:44 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Roybal Olivarez. Filed in State Court on 2/9/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 9:47 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Filed in State Court on 3/15//2023 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |