FOUNTAIN, INC. v. Promate System Corporation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00485 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Promate System Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Fountain, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Wed 04/26 4:05 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (gk) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 04/21 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Fountain, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice.(Sullivan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 04/17 5:04 PM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before May 2, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Fri 04/07 9:32 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Fountain, Inc.. (Sullivan, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Fri 04/07 8:20 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 12:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fountain, Inc., upon Defendant Promate System Corporation served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shawn Pan - Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sullivan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 1:39 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transfer Pursuant to Patent Program (CV-128)
Tue 03/21 11:02 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Case transferred from Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 8:23-cv-00485 AB(KESx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Promate System Corporation. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:22 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff FOUNTAIN, INC., identifying Thomas Fountain. (Sullivan, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 2:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff FOUNTAIN, INC.. (Sullivan, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 2:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FOUNTAIN, INC.. (Sullivan, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34977699 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff FOUNTAIN, INC.. (Attorney Michael Joel Sullivan added to party FOUNTAIN, INC.(pty:pla))(Sullivan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit |