Adrian Romero v. County of Los Angeles et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02025 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 5:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sergio Campos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Damien Guerrero
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrian Romero
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CORREA
Terminated: 05/19/2023
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/17 8:58 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER by Judge George H Wu. Based on said report, the Court takes all previously set dates off-calendar, including the January 18, 2024 post mediation status conference. The Court sets a status conference re settlement for October 10, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status report by October 7. (See document for further details). RE: Joint Report re: Results of Mediation37 . (aco) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Tue 01/16 4:39 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT RE: RESULTS OF MEDIATION AND NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
36 | 36
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 01/16 11:28 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE set on Thursday, January 18, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 01/08 4:35 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION CUTOFF by Judge George H Wu. IT IS SO ORDERED that Courts Order (Doc. 23) is modified and the revised deadlines are now as follows: Mediation Cutoff : January 15, 2024; Proposed Jt. Post Mediation Report: January 16, 2024. RE: Stipulation to Continue,34 . (aco) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
stip
Continue
Fri 01/05 2:42 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Mediation Cutoff from January 10, 2024 to January 15, 2024 Re: Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,23 filed by Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez.(Orletsky, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Re: Stipulation to Continue Mediation Cutoff | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Thu 12/21 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/21 8:55 AM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF DEADLINE by Judge George H Wu. This Court hereby modifies the Court's Order (Doc. 23) as follows: Initial Expert Disclosures 01/19/2024; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures 02/02/2024; Expert Discovery Cut-Off 02/16/2024. RE: Joint STIPULATION to Continue Expert Discovery Cutoff29 . (aco) |
|
31 | 31
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Wed 12/20 12:53 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 1/5/2024 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero(Leap, Shannon) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Wed 12/20 11:08 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge George H Wu. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 10, 2024. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program (213-894-2993) will assign one. The Court further sets a status conference for: 1/18/2024 08:30 AM. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Continue
Tue 12/19 3:04 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Expert Discovery Cutoff from January 26, 2024 to February 16, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero.(Leap, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order (PDF) | ||
28 | 28
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)
Tue 12/19 2:17 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero(Leap, Shannon) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 08/17 1:47 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blessing O. Ekpezu counsel for Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez. Adding Blessing O. Ekpezu as counsel of record for Defendants, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, SERGIO CAMPOS, DAMIEN GUERRERO and JUSTIN PEREZ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, SERGIO CAMPOS, DAMIEN GUERRERO and JUSTIN PEREZ. (Attorney Blessing O. Ekpezu added to party Sergio Campos(pty:dft), Attorney Blessing O. Ekpezu added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Blessing O. Ekpezu added to party Damien Guerrero (pty:dft), Attorney Blessing O. Ekpezu added to party Justin Perez(pty:dft))(Ekpezu, Blessing) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 07/13 2:41 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas C Hurrell counsel for Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles. Sergio Campos, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez. (Hurrell, Thomas) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Mon 06/26 5:05 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo re Stipulation for Protective Order24 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Protective Order
Fri 06/23 9:43 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez.(Orletsky, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/23 9:50 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the May 25, 2023 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to June 2, 2023. A post-mediation status conference is set for January 18, 2024 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by January 10. The pre-trial conference will be held on March 28, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on April 9, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/22 10:02 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the scheduling conference set on Thursday, May 25, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 05/19 1:11 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE REFERENCE TO CORREA by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party20 . All parties are to bear their own costs arising out of this dismissal. (et) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 05/18 1:16 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant CORREA filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero.(Attorney Shannon Joey Leap added to party Adrian Romero(pty:pla))(Leap, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order (PDF) | ||
19 | 19
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/18 12:56 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero.. (Leap, Shannon) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 04/24 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katherine Orletsky counsel for Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez. Adding Katherine E. Orletsky as counsel of record for Defendants County of Los Angeles, Sergio Campos, Damien Guerrero and Justin Perez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles, Sergio Campos, Damien Guerrero and Justin Perez. (Orletsky, Katherine) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 04/24 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Faryar Barzin counsel for Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez. Adding Faryar Barzin as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles, Sergio Campos, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. Sergio Campos, Daminen Guerrero, Justin Perez. (Attorney Faryar Barzin added to party Sergio Campos(pty:dft), Attorney Faryar Barzin added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Faryar Barzin added to party Damien Guerrero (pty:dft), Attorney Faryar Barzin added to party Justin Perez(pty:dft))(Barzin, Faryar) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/20 11:52 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for May 25, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than May 18, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/19 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez, identifying Adrian Romero, County of Los Angeles, Sergio Campos, Damien Guerrero, and Justin Perez. (Hurrell, Thomas) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/19 3:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez.(Attorney Thomas C Hurrell added to party Sergio Campos(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C Hurrell added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C Hurrell added to party Damien Guerrero (pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C Hurrell added to party Justin Perez(pty:dft))(Hurrell, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/06 11:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero, upon Defendant County of Los Angeles served on 3/30/2023, answer due 4/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben, Deputy Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 1:56 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero, upon Defendant Damien Guerrero served on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Chavez - Deputy authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 1:48 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero, upon Defendant Justin Perez served on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Chavez - Deputy authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 1:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero, upon Defendant Sergio Campos served on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Chavez - Deputy authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/22 11:19 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:44 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Sergio Campos, County of Los Angeles, Damien Guerrero, Justin Perez. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:12 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 3:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero, identifying Adrian Romero, County of Los Angeles, Sergio Campos, Damien Guerrero, and Justin Perez. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero. (Galipo, Dale) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34978611 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Adrian Romero. (Attorney Dale K Galipo added to party Adrian Romero(pty:pla))(Galipo, Dale) |