Speedmark Transportation, Inc. v. Tommy Duong et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02027 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Re-opened: | May 12, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tommy Duong
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hecny Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Speedmark Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 11:18 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL [ECF NO. [30-1]] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On January 26, 2024, the Parties filed a proposed order dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to stipulation of the parties and Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. ECF No. 30. The Court, having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: All claims and counterclaims in the above-entitled action are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party to this Stipulation shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 03/12 1:11 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court is in receipt of the Stipulation to Dismiss Case. ECF No.30 . The Court is also in receipt of the proposed order for the Stipulation, in word format, emailed to chambers. Here, the proposed order emailed by the parties is not in the correct format. Pursuant to the Court's operative Standing Order, the parties must use the Court's proposed order template on the Court's website. The Court thus ORDERS the parties to email a word version of the proposed order using the proposed order template on the Court's website to chambers by March 15, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 01/26 2:52 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc..(Kearns, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 11/28 2:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE [ECF NO.28 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered Plaintiff SPEEDMARK TRANSPORTATION, INC. and Defendants HECNY BROKERAGE SERVICES, INC., HECNY TRANSPORTATION, INC. and Deadline, ECF No. 28 and good cause having been shown, ORDERS the following: The fact discovery cut-off will be continued approximately 60 days, from November 15, 2023, to January 15, 2024. The other dates per the Courts Civil Order with respect to the expert discovery cut-off, pre-trial conference and jury trial shall remain the same. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Discovery
Wed 11/15 3:38 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Defendants Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., Hecny Transportation, Inc..(Willis, Brittney) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF BRITTNEY E. WILLIS, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
18
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 08/15 5:10 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for AUGUST 17, 2023, is hereby VACATED. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The discovery cut-off is 11/15/2023. The last date to hear motions is by 2/8/2024. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/21/2024. The Bench Trial is set for 5/20/2024 at 8:30 AM. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/1/2024 at 9:00 AM. Stipulations extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court, and without compelling factual support and a showing of due diligence, stipulations continuing dates set by the Court will be denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) |
|
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 08/14 10:11 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar, with no appearances necessary on August 17, 2023. The Court will issue the Scheduling Order based solely on the parties filings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kmh) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 07/27 5:12 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2, filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc... (Kim, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/28 4:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Mario Aieta APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Speedmark Transportation, designating Angelica A. Zabanal as local counsel. (yl) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 06/23 9:41 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mario Aieta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35543169) filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc.. (Attorney Angelica A Zabanal added to party Speedmark Transportation, Inc.(pty:pla)) (Zabanal, Angelica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 06/20 2:46 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 06/20 4:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATIONFOR EXTENSION OF TIME [ECF NO. 17] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The court, having considered the Parties Third Stipulation, and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that Defendants have until June 16, 2023 to respond to the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/16 5:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Answer by Defendant Tommy Duong filed by Defendant Tommy Duong.(Attorney Robert J Hudock added to party Tommy Duong(pty:dft))(Hudock, Robert) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 06/16 4:07 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., Hecny Transportation, Inc., identifying Defendant Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc.; Defendant Hecny Transportation, Inc.. (Nourani, Leila) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/16 3:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., Hecny Transportation, Inc..(Attorney Leila S Nourani added to party Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Leila S Nourani added to party Hecny Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nourani, Leila) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/09 4:37 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., Hecny Transportation, Inc..(Willis, Brittney) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/15 3:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES15 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong15 . Defendants Tommy Duong, Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., and Hecny Transportation, Inc.s deadline to file a responsive pleading shall be on or before June 9, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 05/11 4:44 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hecny Transportation, Inc. answer now due 9/9/2023; Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc. answer now due 9/9/2023, filed by Defendants Hecny Transportation, Inc.; Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc..(Attorney Frank C Olah added to party Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frank C Olah added to party Hecny Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Olah, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 04/11 5:04 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hecny Transportation, Inc. answer now due 5/12/2023; Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc. answer now due 5/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Hecny Transportation, Inc.; Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc..(Attorney Brittney Elise Willis added to party Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brittney Elise Willis added to party Hecny Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Willis, Brittney) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 03/31 10:36 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Courts website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 9:26 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc., upon Defendant Hecny Transportation, Inc. served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hecny Transportation, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Kim, Diane) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 9:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc., upon Defendant Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc. served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hecny Brokerage Service, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Kim, Diane) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 9:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc., upon Defendant Tommy Duong served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tommy Duong in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kim, Diane) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 10:15 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Tommy Duong, Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., Hecny Transportation, Inc.. (sh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 10:13 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 10:13 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 4:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc.. (Kim, Diane) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc., identifying Speedmark Transportation, Inc., Tommy Duong, Hecny Brokerage Services, Inc., Hecny Transportation, Inc.. (Kim, Diane) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 4:04 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc. identifying Speedmark Transportation, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Kim, Diane) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc.. (Kim, Diane) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34978663 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Speedmark Transportation, Inc.. (Attorney Diane J. Kim added to party Speedmark Transportation, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kim, Diane) |