Martha Beartriz Jimenez et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00471 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2222044 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Keith Glenn Martineau
|
|
Defendant
Ronald Martin Petty
|
|
Defendant
Justin Andrew Sontag
|
|
Defendant
Union Pacific Railroad Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Estate of Gregorio Faustino Juarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Beartriz Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B.J.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S.J.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Appearance
Wed 06/21 3:27 PM
First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brankica Balaban-Calvignac on behalf of Plaintiffs B.J., Estate of Gregorio Faustino Juarez, Martha Beartriz Jimenez, S.J. (Attorney Brankica Balaban-Calvignac added to party B.J.(pty:pla), Attorney Brankica Balaban-Calvignac added to party Estate of Gregorio Faustino Juarez(pty:pla), Attorney Brankica Balaban-Calvignac added to party Martha Beartriz Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Brankica Balaban-Calvignac added to party S.J.(pty:pla))(Balaban-Calvignac, Brankica) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure
Wed 06/21 11:54 AM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF RULE 26 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Gregorio Faustino Juarez, Martha Beartriz Jimenez (Balaban-Calvignac, Brankica) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Thu 05/18 11:42 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp) |
|
12 | 12
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 05/18 11:41 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 5/2/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 7/1/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/16/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report
Thu 05/04 4:33 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Schaff, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on May 18, 2023. (rrp) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 11:38 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Union Pacific Corporation, Southern Pacific Rail Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Schaff, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/22 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:48 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00471 CJC (SHKx). (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/17 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Schaff, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Schaff, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2222044 Receipt No: ACACDC-34978901 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attorney Jason W Schaff added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft))(Schaff, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 3:04 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff S.J., Estate of Gregorio Faustino Juarez and Martha Beartriz Jimenez in San Bernardino Superior Court on 10/4/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |