Adam Ghadiri v. AC Pro Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00488 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
AC Pro Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Gateway Mission Viejo Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Adam Ghadiri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/02 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 11:01 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 2:54 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants AC Pro Inc., Gateway Mission Viejo Inc.. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 Gateway Mission Viejo, Inc | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 3:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri.(Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 As to Defendant 2 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri, identifying AC PRO INC., a corporation; GATEWAY MISSION VIEJO, INC., a corporation,. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34978265 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Attorney Joseph Bakhos added to party Adam Ghadiri(pty:pla))(Bakhos, Joseph) |