NAAC 2022-6 LP v. Kawanna S. Gritney et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01939 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney
1923 East Canova Lane
Compton, CA 90221 |
|
Plaintiff
NAAC 2022-6 LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Tue 06/13 10:21 AM
AMENDED TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, LA County. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, LA County. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/24 10:37 AM
Notice of Objection to Judge Cormac J. Carney's Order to Sua Sponte Remand Case (Doc. #8) filed by - Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (twdb) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 3:09 PM
Notice of Objection to Transfer Case to Judge Cormac J. Carney (Doc #7) Due to Conflict of Interest and Impartially Towrads Counter-Complainant for not Being a State of California Bar Member filed by - Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (twdb) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/23 2:02 PM
Verified ANSWER and Counter-Complaint to California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles Unlawful Detainer Complaint, Case Number 21CMUD01461 filed by plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. Trial by Jury Demand(twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 3:23 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County. (twdb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 03/22 3:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney USA SPONTE REMANDING CASE. Case Remanded to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case number 23CMUD00146. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
7 | 7
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Wed 03/22 11:59 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-cv-02010 CJC(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01939 CJC(KESx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 5:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 5:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5
Fri 03/17 5:10 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Defendant Kawanna S. Gritney. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 5:08 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kawanna S. Gritney, (lh) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, case number 23CMUD00146 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Filing fee $402 PAID, filed by Defendant Kawanna S. Gritney. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |