MPSN Holdings No. 1, LP. v. Terri M. Contreras et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00439 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Terri M. Contreras
8185 Laurel
Fontana, CA 92335 |
|
Plaintiff
MPSN Holdings No. 1, LP.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Receipt
Wed 06/07 2:50 PM
Receipt of remand letter from San Bernardino Superior Court. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Wed 05/24 11:58 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino Superior Court. (twdb) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/24 11:56 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) REMANDING to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino; and (2) DENYING Defendants Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Dkt. No. 3)3 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:09 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 4:06 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Defendant Terri M. Contreras. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Terri M. Contreras, (lh) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Bernardino, case number LLTVA2300047 with CONFORMED FILED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Filed by Defendant Terri M. Contreras. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |