Victoria Dillihunt v. Disneyland
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00473 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Disneyland
|
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Dillihunt
12035 South Broadway Apt K
Los Angeles, CA 90061 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/17 1:18 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS2 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Request is DENIED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victoria Dillihunt, (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 10:30 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Victoria Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Thu 03/16 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Disneyland Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi., filed by plaintiff Victoria Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71 |